Mobile and Manufactured Homes

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 4

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0163 / CH0287
    (SB0162 / CH0286)
St. Mary's County - Mobile Home Parks - RepealSt. Mary's County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 287Environment and Transportation
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsCounties - Local Laws (L2)
SB0020Wicomico County - Vehicle Dealer's Licenses - Motor Home and Travel Trailer ShowsSenator MathiasIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
1/17/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
SB0162 / CH0286
    (HB0163 / CH0287)
St. Mary's County - Mobile Home Parks - RepealSenator WaughApproved by the Governor - Chapter 286Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/31/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Local Laws (L2)
SB1005Real Property - Mobile Home Parks - Rent IncreasesSenator JenningsIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
3/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
Real Property (N1)

Denotes enacted legislation

April 26, 2017 1:55 P.M.