Mortgages

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 19

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0274 / CH0592
    (SB0708)
Residential Property - Statute of Limitations for Certain Specialties and Motion for Certain Deficiency JudgmentsDelegate LaffertyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 592Environmental Matters
2/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB0366Home Act of 2014Delegate LaffertyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; WithdrawnEnvironmental Matters Human Relations (D5)
HB0453 / CH0229Housing and Community Development - Multifamily Rental Housing Programs Efficiency ActChair, Environmental Matters CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 229Environmental Matters
2/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB0553 / CH0410Housing - Energy-Efficient Homes Construction Loan ProgramChair, Environmental Matters CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 410Environmental Matters
2/21/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/1/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB0735
    (SB0583 / CH0306)
Financial Institutions - Interest Payable on Escrow Accounts and Specific Purpose Savings AccountsDelegate OlszewskiVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Economic Matters
2/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Financial Institutions (I1)
HB0923 / CH0529
    (SB0596 / CH0528)
Income Tax Subtraction Modification - Mortgage Forgiveness Debt Relief - ExtensionDelegate ZuckerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 529Ways and Means
3/7/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB1021Prince George's County - Foreclosure - Report by Department of Housing and Community Development and Commissioner of Financial Regulation PG 411-14Prince George's County DelegationIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesEnvironmental Matters
4/1/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules Real Property (N1)
HB1045 / CH0634Real Property - Lien Priority of Refinance Mortgages - Escrow CostsDelegate AroraApproved by the Governor - Chapter 634Environmental Matters
2/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB1319Real Property - Foreclosures - Deficiency Judgments Prohibited and Definition of "Secured Party" (Foreclosure Protection Act)Delegate MizeurIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
2/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB1322
    (SB0755)
Foreclosure - Moratorium, Notices, Penalties, Redemption Period, and StudyDelegate BraveboyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
2/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB1346
    (SB0850 / CH0561)
Real Property - Prohibition on Acquiring Mortgages or Deeds of Trust by CondemnationDelegate Robinson, S.In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
3/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB1527Real Property - Bankruptcy Proceedings - Expedited Foreclosure TimelineDelegate BraveboyIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations Real Property (N1)
SB0230Real Property - Priority of Refinance Mortgage Over Junior Liens - Amount of Refinance MortgageSenator FroshIn the Senate - Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
1/30/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB0583 / CH0306
    (HB0735)
Financial Institutions - Interest Payable on Escrow Accounts and Specific Purpose Savings AccountsSenator KelleyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 306Finance
2/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters Financial Institutions (I1)
SB0596 / CH0528
    (HB0923 / CH0529)
Income Tax Subtraction Modification - Mortgage Forgiveness Debt Relief - ExtensionSenator PetersApproved by the Governor - Chapter 528Budget and Taxation
2/26/2014 - 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/2/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB0708
    (HB0274 / CH0592)
Residential Property - Statute of Limitations for Certain Specialties and Motion for Certain Deficiency JudgmentsSenator RaskinVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
4/3/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0755
    (HB1322)
Foreclosure - Moratorium, Notices, Penalties, Redemption Period, and StudySenator MuseIn the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB0850 / CH0561
    (HB1346)
Real Property - Prohibition on Acquiring Mortgages or Deeds of Trust by Condemnation and Related StudySenator ConwayApproved by the Governor - Chapter 561Judicial Proceedings
3/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
4/3/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB1091 / CH0579Financial Institutions - Registered Mortgage Loan Originators - Expedited LicensesSenator KlausmeierApproved by the Governor - Chapter 579Finance
3/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
4/1/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Financial Institutions (I1)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:35 P.M.