Motor Vehicle Equipment

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 33

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0051Vehicle Laws - Electric Personal Assistive Mobility Device - DefinitionDelegate LamIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsEnvironment and Transportation
1/26/2017 - 2:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous (R7)
HB0066 / CH0385Environment - Lead and Mercury Wheel Weights - ProhibitedDelegate LamApproved by the Governor - Chapter 385Environment and Transportation
1/25/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB0110Electric Vehicles and Recharging Equipment - Rebates and Tax Credits - ExtensionDelegate Fraser-HidalgoIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Transportation (Q5)
HB0341Maryland Student Transportation Safety ActDelegate MieleIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0406 / CH0362
    (SB0315)
Clean Cars Act of 2017SpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 362Environment and Transportation
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/4/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
Taxes - Transportation (Q5)
HB0494 / CH0749
    (SB0086 / CH0750)
Motor Vehicles - Use of Fog Lights When Windshield Wipers Operating - RepealDelegate SteinApproved by the Governor - Chapter 749Environment and Transportation
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsVehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections (R6)
HB0536Vehicle Laws - Speed Monitoring, Work Zone Speed Control, and Traffic Control Signal Monitoring Systems - RepealDelegate Miller, W.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB0757Evidence - Violation of Ignition Interlock System RequirementDelegate DumaisIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Drunk Driving (R3)
HB0768
    (SB0917 / CH0353)
Motor Vehicles - Seasonal Exceptional Poultry Hauling PermitDelegate OttoIn the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)Environment and Transportation
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsVehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections (R6)
HB0783Vehicle Equipment - Driver Alcohol Detection System for Safety ProgramDelegate KramerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections (R6)
HB0784
    (SB0523)
Transportation - Ignition Interlock Devices - DefinitionDelegate KramerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Drunk Driving (R3)
HB0889 / CH0748Vehicle Laws - HOV Lanes - Tow TrucksDelegate SteinApproved by the Governor - Chapter 748Environment and Transportation
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB0940
    (SB0987)
Education - School Vehicles Used by Private Entities - Seat Belt RequirementDelegate HaynesIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/24/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0952 / CH0753
    (SB0707 / CH0752)
Vehicle Law - Waste and Recycling Collection Vehicles - Use of Yellow and Amber Lights (The Senator Bob Hooper Sanitation Safety Act)Delegate HealeyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 753Environment and Transportation
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsVehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections (R6)
HB1000Motor Vehicles - Gross Vehicle Weight - Agricultural ProductsDelegate ReillyIn the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections (R6)
HB1285Motor Vehicles - Passenger Seat Belt Requirement - Primary OffenseDelegate SteinIn the House - Recommitted to Environment and Transportation (Delegate Beidle)Environment and Transportation
3/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections (R6)
HB1296Vehicle Laws - Class G (Trailer) Vehicles - Permanent RegistrationDelegate GlassIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB1335 / CH0756
    (SB0012)
Vehicle Laws - Obstruction Hanging From Rearview Mirror - EnforcementDelegate WilkinsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 756Environment and Transportation
3/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsVehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB1410Vehicle Laws - Protective Headgear Requirement for Motorcycle Riders - ExceptionDelegate AndersonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB1490Drunk Driving - Administrative Per Se Offenses - Ignition Interlock System ProgramDelegate DumaisIn the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Drunk Driving (R3)
SB0012
    (HB1335 / CH0756)
Vehicle Laws - Obstruction Hanging From Rearview Mirror - EnforcementSenator RamirezVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judicial Proceedings
1/17/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
SB0086 / CH0750
    (HB0494 / CH0749)
Motor Vehicles - Use of Fog Lights When Windshield Wipers Operating - RepealSenator NormanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 750Judicial Proceedings
1/17/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections (R6)
SB0155School Vehicles - Seat Belts - RequirementsSenator BrochinIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
1/25/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0165 / CH0055Code Revision - Maryland Vehicle Law - PenaltiesPresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 55Judicial Proceedings
1/25/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous (R7)
SB0284Vehicle-Miles-Traveled Tax and Associated Mandated Devices - ProhibitionSenator ReadyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Transportation (Q5)
SB0315
    (HB0406 / CH0362)
Clean Cars Act of 2017PresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)Finance
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
Taxes - Transportation (Q5)
SB0393 / CH0363Clean Cars Act of 2017Senator MannoApproved by the Governor - Chapter 363Budget and Taxation
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and TransportationTaxes - Transportation (Q5)
SB0523
    (HB0784)
Transportation - Ignition Interlock Devices - DefinitionSenator LeeIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Drunk Driving (R3)
SB0668 / CH0751Vehicle Laws - Operation of Motorcycles - Handlebar HeightSenator NormanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 751Judicial Proceedings
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections (R6)
SB0707 / CH0752
    (HB0952 / CH0753)
Vehicle Law - Waste and Recycling Collection Vehicles - Use of Yellow and Amber Lights (The Senator Bob Hooper Sanitation Safety Act)Senator NormanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 752Judicial Proceedings
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections (R6)
SB0917 / CH0353
    (HB0768)
Motor Vehicles - Seasonal Exceptional Poultry Hauling PermitSenator MathiasApproved by the Governor - Chapter 353Judicial Proceedings
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections (R6)
SB0987
    (HB0940)
Education - School Vehicles Used by Private Entities - Seat Belt RequirementSenator Nathan-PulliamIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB1007Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Replacement Parts for Damaged Motor VehiclesSenator JenningsIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinanceInsurance - Other than Health (C4)

Denotes enacted legislation

June 7, 2017 9:53 A.M.