Motor Vehicle Equipment

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 29

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0046Motor Vehicles - Farm Equipment - Wide- or Oversize-Load SignalsDelegate FoldenIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
1/25/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections (R6)
HB0060Vehicle Laws - Electric Personal Assistive Mobility Device - DefinitionDelegate LamIn the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
1/25/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous (R7)
HB0106 / CH0186
    (SB0475 / CH0187)
Emergency Vehicles - Organ Delivery VehiclesDelegate BuschApproved by the Governor - Chapter 186Environment and Transportation
2/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsVehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections (R6)
HB0123Emergency Vehicles - Blood, Organ, or Tissue Delivery VehiclesDelegate AngelIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and TransportationVehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections (R6)
HB0253 / CH0543Motor Vehicles - Automobile TransportersChair, Environment and Transportation CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 543Environment and Transportation
2/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections (R6)
HB0316Vehicle Emissions Inspection Program - Exemptions - Vehicles With Low Annual MileageDelegate WivellIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections (R6)
HB0330 / CH0174
    (SB0215 / CH0175)
Motor Vehicle Registration - Exception for Golf Carts - Town of ViennaDelegate MautzApproved by the Governor - Chapter 174Environment and Transportation
2/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsVehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB0473Baltimore City - Private Passenger Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Notice and Use of Consumer ReportDelegate AliIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Other than Health (C4)
HB0595Evidence - Violation of Ignition Interlock System RequirementDelegate DumaisIn the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0)Judiciary
2/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Drunk Driving (R3)
HB0646 / CH0494
    (SB1069 / CH0495)
Motor Vehicles - Gross Vehicle Weight - Agricultural ProductsDelegate ReillyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 494Environment and Transportation
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsVehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections (R6)
HB0862Transportation - Ignition Interlock Devices - DefinitionDelegate KramerIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
2/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Drunk Driving (R3)
HB1164Vehicle Laws - Rear-Facing Child Safety Seats - RequirementDelegate AdamsIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections (R6)
HB1204Task Force to Study Impaired Driving and New TechnologiesDelegate Valentino-SmithIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/2/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Drunk Driving (R3)
HB1384Motor Vehicles - School Vehicles - Flashing Advisory SignsDelegate MieleIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and TransportationVehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections (R6)
HB1391Driving Under the Influence of Alcohol - Subsequent Offenders - Mandatory Ignition InterlockDelegate CilibertiIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
3/2/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Drunk Driving (R3)
HB1403Motor Vehicles – Failure to Use Seat Belts – PenaltiesDelegate Fraser-HidalgoIn the Senate - Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/3/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections (R6)
HB1447Ignition Interlock System Program - Administrative Offenses - Out-of-State Licensed DriversDelegate VallarioIn the Senate - Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/2/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/3/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Drunk Driving (R3)
HB1501Hospitals - Education - Child Safety Seat RequirementsDelegate LamIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government OperationsHealth Care Facilities and Regulation (J3)
HB1543Tow Trucks – Driver Safety ActDelegate LisantiIn the Senate - Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/3/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections (R6)
HB1605Task Force on Maryland Student Transportation SafetyDelegate MieleIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1714Vehicle Laws - Police Vehicles - Use of Cruise or Directional Marker LightsDelegate MosbyIn the Senate - Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/3/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections (R6)
HB1771Motor Vehicle Registration – Exception for Low Speed Electric Vehicles – City of Havre de GraceDelegate LisantiIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsVehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
SB0215 / CH0175
    (HB0330 / CH0174)
Motor Vehicle Registration - Exception for Golf Carts - Town of ViennaSenator EckardtApproved by the Governor - Chapter 175Judicial Proceedings
2/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and TransportationVehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
SB0353 / CH0541Vehicle Laws - Golf Carts - City of CrisfieldSenator MathiasApproved by the Governor - Chapter 541Judicial Proceedings
2/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
SB0363Vehicle-Miles-Traveled Tax and Associated Mandated Devices - ProhibitionSenator ReadyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Transportation (Q5)
SB0439Vehicle Laws - Protective Headgear Requirement for Motorcycle Riders - ExceptionSenator NormanIn the Senate - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
SB0475 / CH0187
    (HB0106 / CH0186)
Emergency Vehicles - Organ Delivery VehiclesSenator MiddletonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 187Judicial Proceedings
2/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and TransportationVehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections (R6)
SB0743 / CH0852
    (HB1045)
Peer–to–Peer Car Sharing ProgramsSenator MiddletonEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 852Finance
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
4/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Other than Health (C4)
SB1069 / CH0495
    (HB0646 / CH0494)
Motor Vehicles - Gross Vehicle Weight - Agricultural ProductsSenator MathiasApproved by the Governor - Chapter 495Judicial Proceedings
3/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and TransportationVehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections (R6)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 31, 2018 1:04 P.M.