Motor Vehicle Insurance

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 24

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0003 / CH0028
    (SB0054 / CH0016)
Public Utilities - Transportation Network Services and For-Hire Transportation - ClarificationsDelegate DavisEnacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 28Economic Matters
1/21/2016 - 3:00 p.m.
Finance
3/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
HB0060 / CH0084Insurance - Certificate of Qualification, Licensing, and Registration - Electronic MeansChair, Economic Matters CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 84Economic Matters
1/28/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/30/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Other than Health (C4)
HB0501 / CH0488Motor Vehicle Insurance - Volunteer DriversDelegate ChangApproved by the Governor - Chapter 488Economic Matters
2/11/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Other than Health (C4)
HB0667
    (SB0553)
Private Passenger Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Enhanced Underinsured Motorist CoverageDelegate BarkleyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/18/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Other than Health (C4)
HB0720 / CH0402
    (SB0544 / CH0401)
Motor Vehicle Insurance - Insurance Identification Card - Carrying Proof of Coverage - Uninsured Motorist Education and Enforcement FundDelegate KramerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 402Economic Matters
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Other than Health (C4)
HB0900 / CH0426
    (SB0784 / CH0425)
Motor Vehicle Insurance - Personal Injury Protection - Rejection of CoverageDelegate FrickApproved by the Governor - Chapter 426Economic Matters
3/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/7/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Other than Health (C4)
HB0912 / CH0447
    (SB0888 / CH0446)
Motor Vehicle Insurance - Program to Incentivize and Enable Uninsured Vehicle Owners to Be InsuredDelegate FrickApproved by the Governor - Chapter 447Economic Matters
3/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/7/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Other than Health (C4)
HB1120Family Law - Automatic InjunctionDelegate DumaisIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB1165Vehicle Laws - Lapse or Termination of Required Security - NoticeDelegate LisantiIn the Senate - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
3/3/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB1258Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Replacement Parts for Damaged Motor VehiclesDelegate ImpallariaIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
3/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Other than Health (C4)
HB1348
    (SB0854)
Uninsured Motor Vehicle Coverage - ExclusionDelegate BrooksIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic MattersInsurance - Other than Health (C4)
HB1356Motor Vehicles - Vehicle Event Data RecordersDelegate LamIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and Transportation
3/4/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections (R6)
HB1518
    (SB1122)
Mopeds and Motor Scooters - Failure to Carry Required Security - PenaltyDelegate BeidleIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsVehicle Laws - Miscellaneous (R7)
HB1641Vehicle Laws - Proof of Insurance for Motor Vehicles Registered in Another StateDelegate ParrottIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsVehicle Laws - Miscellaneous (R7)
SB0054 / CH0016
    (HB0003 / CH0028)
Public Utilities - Transportation Network Services and For-Hire Transportation - ClarificationsSenator MiddletonEnacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 16Finance
1/19/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersUtility Regulation (C5)
SB0544 / CH0401
    (HB0720 / CH0402)
Motor Vehicle Insurance - Insurance Identification Card - Carrying Proof of Coverage - Uninsured Motorist Education and Enforcement FundSenator MiddletonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 401Finance
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersInsurance - Other than Health (C4)
SB0553
    (HB0667)
Private Passenger Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Enhanced Underinsured Motorist CoverageSenator AstleIn the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Other than Health (C4)
SB0751
    (HB1172)
Vehicle Laws - Rental Vehicle Companies - Right of SubrogationSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Favorable with Amendments Report by FinanceFinance
3/15/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous (R7)
SB0784 / CH0425
    (HB0900 / CH0426)
Motor Vehicle Insurance - Personal Injury Protection - Rejection of CoverageSenator MiddletonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 425Finance
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersInsurance - Other than Health (C4)
SB0854
    (HB1348)
Uninsured Motor Vehicle Coverage - ExclusionSenator KelleyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by FinanceFinance
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Other than Health (C4)
SB0888 / CH0446
    (HB0912 / CH0447)
Motor Vehicle Insurance - Program to Incentivize and Enable Uninsured Vehicle Owners to Be InsuredSenator MiddletonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 446Finance
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersInsurance - Other than Health (C4)
SB0915Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Advance of Medical ExpensesSenator JenningsIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by FinanceFinance
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Other than Health (C4)
SB1028Motor Vehicle Insurance - Discrimination in Underwriting and Rating - ProhibitionsSenator PughIn the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Other than Health (C4)
SB1122
    (HB1518)
Mopeds and Motor Scooters - Failure to Carry Required Security - PenaltySenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous (R7)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:05 P.M.