Motor Vehicle Registration

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 24

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0001Motor Vehicles - Special Registration Plates - Confederate Battle FlagDelegate BarveIn the Senate - Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
1/28/2016 - 1:30 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB0003 / CH0028
    (SB0054 / CH0016)
Public Utilities - Transportation Network Services and For-Hire Transportation - ClarificationsDelegate DavisEnacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 28Economic Matters
1/21/2016 - 3:00 p.m.
Finance
3/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
HB0058 / CH0608Vehicle Laws - Historic Motor Vehicles - Authorized Uses and InspectionsDelegate O'DonnellApproved by the Governor - Chapter 608Environment and Transportation
1/28/2016 - 1:30 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB0088Automated Motor Vehicles - Titling, Registration, and Rules of the RoadDelegate ChangIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and Transportation
2/4/2016 - 2:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB0181Motor Vehicles - Registration Cards - Digital or Electronic ImagesDelegate TarlauIn the House - Referred to interim study by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/11/2016 - 1:30 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB0253 / CH0257
    (SB0309)
Motor Vehicle Registration - Exception for Golf Carts - City of CrisfieldDelegate OttoApproved by the Governor - Chapter 257Environment and Transportation
2/18/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsVehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB0392
    (SB0274)
Vehicle Laws - Special Registration Plates - Retired Law Enforcement OfficersDelegate Fraser-HidalgoIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and Transportation
2/25/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB0459 / CH0316
    (SB0389)
Birth and Death Certificates - Fee ReductionSpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 316Ways and Means
3/7/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Budget and Taxation
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB0681Vehicle Laws - School Vehicles - DefinitionDelegate LamIn the Senate - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
2/25/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous (R7)
HB0723
    (SB0585)
Transportation - Highway User Revenues - Distribution to MunicipalitiesDelegate BeidleIn the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
2/25/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Highways (R1)
HB1102Vehicle Laws - Special Registration Plates - Celebrating Maryland Native Plants and PollinatorsDelegate AfzaliIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB1165Vehicle Laws - Lapse or Termination of Required Security - NoticeDelegate LisantiIn the Senate - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
3/3/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB1328Environment - Lead and Mercury Wheel Weights - ProhibitedDelegate LamIn the Senate - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB1627Vehicle Laws - Class G (Trailer) Vehicles - Permanent RegistrationDelegate GlassIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsVehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
SB0023Vehicle Laws - Title Service Agents - Out-of-State Vehicle RegistrationsSenator YoungIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
1/19/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
SB0054 / CH0016
    (HB0003 / CH0028)
Public Utilities - Transportation Network Services and For-Hire Transportation - ClarificationsSenator MiddletonEnacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 16Finance
1/19/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersUtility Regulation (C5)
SB0125Vehicle Emissions Inspection Program - ExemptionsSenator SerafiniIn the Senate - Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections (R6)
SB0183School Vehicles - Seat Belts - RequirementsSenator BrochinIn the Senate - Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0274
    (HB0392)
Vehicle Laws - Special Registration Plates - Retired Law Enforcement OfficersSenator KingIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial ProceedingsVehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
SB0309
    (HB0253 / CH0257)
Motor Vehicle Registration - Exception for Golf Carts - City of CrisfieldSenator MathiasVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judicial Proceedings
2/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
SB0389
    (HB0459 / CH0316)
Birth and Death Certificates - Fee ReductionPresidentIn the House - Hearing 4/09 at 9:30 a.m.Budget and Taxation
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/9/2016 - 9:30 a.m.
Appropriations
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB0544 / CH0401
    (HB0720 / CH0402)
Motor Vehicle Insurance - Insurance Identification Card - Carrying Proof of Coverage - Uninsured Motorist Education and Enforcement FundSenator MiddletonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 401Finance
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersInsurance - Other than Health (C4)
SB0585
    (HB0723)
Transportation - Highway User Revenues - Distribution to MunicipalitiesSenator KingIn the House - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/2/2016 - 3:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Highways (R1)
SB0986
    (HB0985)
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Olney Theatre CenterSenator ZuckerIn the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 3:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/12/2016 - 3:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:05 P.M.