Motor Vehicle Registration

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 31

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0073Vehicle Laws - Multiyear RegistrationDelegate CarrIn the House - Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
1/25/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB0294Vehicle Laws - Registration Fees - Refunds on Surrender of Registration Card and PlatesDelegate WivellIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB0316Vehicle Emissions Inspection Program - Exemptions - Vehicles With Low Annual MileageDelegate WivellIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections (R6)
HB0330 / CH0174
    (SB0215 / CH0175)
Motor Vehicle Registration - Exception for Golf Carts - Town of ViennaDelegate MautzApproved by the Governor - Chapter 174Environment and Transportation
2/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsVehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB0426Manufactured Homes - Severance From Real Property - Emergency EvacuationsDelegate VogtIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB0492Vehicle Laws - Civil Violations - Administrative PenaltiesDelegate AliIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB0749
    (SB0551)
Vehicle Laws – Dedicated Bus Lanes – EnforcementDelegate Lewis, R.In the Senate - First Reading Judicial ProceedingsEnvironment and Transportation
2/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsVehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB0807 / CH0330
    (SB0516 / CH0331)
Transportation – Highway User Revenues – DistributionDelegate BeidleApproved by the Governor - Chapter 330Environment and Transportation
2/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Highways (R1)
HB0987Vehicle Laws - Security Lapses - Notice to Maryland Automobile Insurance FundDelegate BrooksIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
2/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous (R7)
HB0998Vehicle Laws - Drivers' Schools - Age of Instruction VehiclesDelegate McConkeyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB1011Vehicle Laws - Special Registration Plate - Thin Blue LineDelegate ImpallariaIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB1139Baltimore City – Vehicle Height Monitoring Systems – EnforcementDelegate LiermanIn the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial ProceedingsEnvironment and Transportation
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsVehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB1161 / CH0195
    (SB0856 / CH0196)
Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund - Uninsured Division - Uninsured MotoristsDelegate BrooksApproved by the Governor - Chapter 195Economic Matters
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Other than Health (C4)
HB1162 / CH0157
    (SB0626 / CH0158)
Vehicle Registration – Exemption From Registration Fees – Surviving Spouses of VeteransDelegate Young, P.Approved by the Governor - Chapter 157Environment and Transportation
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsVehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB1261Vehicle Laws - Temporary Registration - Out-of-State and Foreign VehiclesDelegate ReyIn the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB1265Vehicle Registration - Special Plates for Honorably Discharged VeteransDelegate Young, P.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and Transportation
3/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB1391Driving Under the Influence of Alcohol - Subsequent Offenders - Mandatory Ignition InterlockDelegate CilibertiIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
3/2/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Drunk Driving (R3)
HB1644Vehicle Laws - Registration Fee Exemption - Active Military and VeteransDelegate CordermanIn the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB1759Vehicle Laws - Personal Motor Vehicle RentalsDelegate FlanaganIn the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous (R7)
HB1771Motor Vehicle Registration – Exception for Low Speed Electric Vehicles – City of Havre de GraceDelegate LisantiIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsVehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
SB0012Motor Vehicle Laws - Registration Plates - Single Registration Plate RequirementSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
1/18/2018 - 3:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
SB0044Vehicle Laws - School Buses - Inspection, Repair, and Maintenance RequirementsSenator YoungIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/17/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections (R6)
SB0215 / CH0175
    (HB0330 / CH0174)
Motor Vehicle Registration - Exception for Golf Carts - Town of ViennaSenator EckardtApproved by the Governor - Chapter 175Judicial Proceedings
2/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and TransportationVehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
SB0362 / CH0704Vehicle Laws - Registration Fee Exemptions - Disabled VeteransSenator ReadyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 704Judicial Proceedings
2/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
SB0516 / CH0331
    (HB0807 / CH0330)
Transportation - Highway User Revenues - DistributionSenator MadalenoApproved by the Governor - Chapter 331Budget and Taxation
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and TransportationTransportation - Highways (R1)
SB0551
    (HB0749)
Vehicle Laws - Bus Lane Monitoring Cameras - AuthorizationSenator ConwayIn the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
SB0573Vehicle Laws - Rental Vehicles - SecuritySenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous (R7)
SB0626 / CH0158
    (HB1162 / CH0157)
Vehicle Registration – Exemption From Registration Fees – Surviving Spouses of VeteransSenator SmithApproved by the Governor - Chapter 158Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and TransportationVehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
SB0743 / CH0852
    (HB1045)
Peer–to–Peer Car Sharing ProgramsSenator MiddletonEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 852Finance
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
4/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Other than Health (C4)
SB0856 / CH0196
    (HB1161 / CH0195)
Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund - Uninsured Division - Uninsured MotoristsSenator MiddletonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 196Finance
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersInsurance - Other than Health (C4)
SB1265 / CH0030Maryland Safe to Learn Act of 2018Senator KlausmeierApproved by the Governor - Chapter 30Budget and Taxation
3/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 31, 2018 1:04 P.M.