Names

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 34

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0004 / CH0020Toll Bridges – Renaming Harry W. Nice Memorial Bridge – Harry W. Nice/Thomas "Mac" Middleton BridgeDelegate JamesonEnacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 20Environment and Transportation
3/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/26/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Highways (R1)
HB0009 / CH0278Transportation - Dedication of StructuresDelegate FoldenApproved by the Governor - Chapter 278Environment and Transportation
3/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Highways (R1)
HB0054
    (SB0024 / CH0223)
State Highway Administration - Sale or Lease of Naming Rights for Rest Areas and Welcome CentersDelegate LamVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Environment and Transportation
3/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/3/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Highways (R1)
HB0179Condominiums - Amendment of DeclarationsDelegate CarrIn the House - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
2/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB0533 / CH0355
    (SB0494 / CH0356)
Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority Compact – Department of Planning – Name CorrectionDelegate CarrApproved by the Governor - Chapter 355Environment and Transportation
2/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
HB0547 / CH0555
    (SB0373 / CH0556)
Education – Head Start Program – Annual Appropriation (The Ulysses Currie Act)Delegate BarronApproved by the Governor - Chapter 555Appropriations
2/8/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0655
    (SB0392)
Maryland Department of Health - Biosafety Level 3 LaboratoriesDelegate Young, K.In the Senate - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Care Facilities and Regulation (J3)
HB0740 / CH0825
    (SB0693 / CH0826)
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Ticket Website Domain NamesDelegate ClippingerEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 825Economic Matters
2/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)
HB0755 / CH0460Campaign Finance – Contributions in Name of Another – Fair Campaign Financing FundDelegate MosbyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 460Ways and Means
2/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0763Campaign Finance Reports - Business Contributors - Registration StatusDelegate MosbyIn the House - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0947
    (SB0958)
Natural Resources - Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays 2010 Trust Fund - Purpose and Authorized Use of FundsDelegate BeitzelIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Natural Resources - Generally (M1)
HB0982 / CH0399
    (SB0631)
Higher Education Outreach and College Access Pilot Program – Alterations and Extension of SunsetDelegate Washington, A.Approved by the Governor - Chapter 399Ways and Means
2/23/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHigher Education (F2)
HB0987Vehicle Laws - Security Lapses - Notice to Maryland Automobile Insurance FundDelegate BrooksIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
2/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous (R7)
HB0999Baltimore City - Chief Executive Officer of the Baltimore City Board of School Commissioners - Title ChangeDelegate HaynesIn the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/23/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education - Local Bills (F3)
HB1075State Finance and Procurement - Preferences - NonprofitsDelegate WilsonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government OperationsState Government - Procurement (P2)
HB1353Local Boards of Education - Fields and Courts - Naming RightsDelegate MieleIn the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/9/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1355
    (SB1067)
Unborn Child Protection From Dismemberment Abortion Act of 2018Delegate WivellIn the House - Hearing 3/09 at 2:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/9/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB1436Maryland Transit Administration - Purple Line Transit Stations - NamingPrince George's County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and TransportationTransportation - Generally (R2)
HB1472Maryland Stadium Authority - Use of State Owned or Leased Suite - DisclosureDelegate ReznikIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB1527
    (SB1075)
Health Insurance - Freedom of Choice of Pharmacy ActDelegate CarozzaIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government OperationsInsurance - Health (C3)
HB1735Civil Actions – Name Change Not in Connection With Divorce or AdoptionDelegate McMillanIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsCivil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB1783 / CH0014
    (SB1243)
21st Century School Facilities ActDelegate JonesGubernatorial Veto Override - Chapter 14Appropriations
3/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0024 / CH0223
    (HB0054)
State Highway Administration - Sale or Lease of Naming Rights for Rest Areas and Welcome CentersSenator KlausmeierApproved by the Governor - Chapter 223Finance
1/24/2018 - 2:30 p.m.
Environment and TransportationTransportation - Highways (R1)
SB0065Real Property - Regulation of Common Ownership Community ManagersSenator BensonIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial ProceedingsReal Property (N1)
SB0067Department of Commerce - Maryland Economic Development Assistance Authority and Fund - Renaming and RevisingChair, Finance CommitteeIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersFinance
1/18/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB0373 / CH0556
    (HB0547 / CH0555)
Education – Head Start Program – Annual Appropriation (The Ulysses Currie Act)Senator CurrieApproved by the Governor - Chapter 556Budget and Taxation
2/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/20/2018 - 1:15 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0392
    (HB0655)
Maryland Department of Health - Biosafety Level 3 LaboratoriesSenator YoungIn the Senate - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Care Facilities and Regulation (J3)
SB0494 / CH0356
    (HB0533 / CH0355)
Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority Compact - Department of Planning - Name CorrectionSenator FeldmanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 356Finance
2/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and TransportationTransportation - Generally (R2)
SB0631
    (HB0982 / CH0399)
Higher Education Outreach and College Access Pilot Program - Alterations and Extension of SunsetSenator RosapepeIn the House - Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
SB0693 / CH0826
    (HB0740 / CH0825)
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Ticket Website Domain NamesSenator FeldmanEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 826Finance
2/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersCommercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)
SB0958
    (HB0947)
Natural Resources - Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays 2010 Trust Fund - Purpose and Authorized Use of FundsSenator EdwardsIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Natural Resources - Generally (M1)
SB1067
    (HB1355)
Unborn Child Protection From Dismemberment Abortion Act of 2018Senator ReadyIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRulesPublic Health (J1)
SB1075
    (HB1527)
Health Insurance - Freedom of Choice of Pharmacy ActSenator MathiasIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinanceInsurance - Health (C3)
SB1259 / CH0370Harford County District Courthouse – H. Wayne Norman, Jr. Memorial PlazaSenator CassillyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 370Judicial Proceedings
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Courts and Court Personnel - Local (D2)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 31, 2018 1:02 P.M.