Negligence

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 14

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0189Courts - Peace Orders - Acts Committed Against EmployeesSenator FeldmanIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
2/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB0326
    (SB0333)
Criminal Procedure - Vulnerable Adult Abuse RegistryDelegate GlennIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0618Civil Actions - Liability for Personal Injury or Death Caused by DogDelegate SmigielIn the House - Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB1110Consumer Protection - Sales of Tires - Limitations and Required NoticeDelegate KramerIn the House - Referred to interim study by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)
HB1156
    (SB0819)
Maryland Contributory Negligence ActDelegate KramerIn the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB1182Courts - Commission to Study Maryland's Fault Allocation SystemDelegate DumaisIn the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB1184
    (SB0847)
Criminal Law - Motor Vehicles - Criminal Negligence Resulting in DeathDelegate Valentino-SmithIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB1312
    (SB0456)
Pain-Capable Unborn Child Protection ActDelegate ParrottIn the House - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/15/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB1336Driver's Education - Income Tax Credit - Assessment of Fees for Driving OffensesDelegate Miller, A.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Drunk Driving (R3)
HB1449Council for the Procurement of Health, Educational, and Social Services - Term LimitsDelegate ReznikIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsState Government - Procurement (P2)
SB0333
    (HB0326)
Criminal Procedure - Vulnerable Adult Abuse RegistrySenator GladdenIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0456
    (HB1312)
Pain-Capable Unborn Child Protection ActSenator ReillyIn the Senate - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0819
    (HB1156)
Maryland Contributory Negligence ActSenator DeGrangeIn the Senate - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0847
    (HB1184)
Criminal Law - Motor Vehicles - Criminal Negligence Resulting in DeathSenator StoneIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings
3/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)

December 8, 2015 2:29 P.M.