News Media

2015 Regular Session

Total Bills: 12

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0008Uniform Act to Secure the Attendance of Witnesses From Without the State in Criminal Proceedings - News Media PrivilegeDelegate RosenbergIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
2/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/31/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0219Independent Expenditures and Electioneering Communications - Registration and ReportingDelegate MorhaimIn the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0226
    (SB0311)
Election Law - Casting of Ballot by Mail - Public CommunicationsDelegate MorhaimIn the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0770
    (SB0573 / CH0367)
Insurance - Standard Valuation Law and Reserve and Nonforfeiture RequirementsDelegate DavisVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Health and Government Operations
3/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Other than Health (C4)
HB0786 / CH0103
    (SB0613)
Self-Service Storage Facilities - Enforcement of Lien - ProceduresDelegate DavisApproved by the Governor - Chapter 103Economic Matters
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Commercial Law - Generally (I4)
HB1019
    (SB0532)
Farmers' Rights ActDelegate Fraser-HidalgoIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and TransportationCommercial Law - Generally (I4)
SB0311
    (HB0226)
Election Law - Casting of Ballot by Mail - Public CommunicationsSenator RosapepeIn the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB0360 / CH0162Calvert County - Budget Hearings and ProceduresCalvert County SenatorsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 162Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Local Laws (L2)
SB0532
    (HB1019)
Farmers' Rights ActSenator MadalenoIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by FinanceFinance
3/5/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Commercial Law - Generally (I4)
SB0573 / CH0367
    (HB0770)
Insurance - Standard Valuation Law and Reserve and Nonforfeiture RequirementsSenator KelleyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 367Finance
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/2/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Other than Health (C4)
SB0613
    (HB0786 / CH0103)
Self-Service Storage Facilities - Enforcement of Lien - ProceduresSenator AstleVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Finance
3/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersCommercial Law - Generally (I4)
SB0725
    (HB0967)
Baltimore County Board of Education - Procurement for Construction-Related Projects for SchoolsSenator ZirkinIn the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education - Miscellaneous (F5)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:42 P.M.