News Media

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 18

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0081Criminal Procedure - Cameras in the Courtroom - Criminal Sentencing HearingsDelegate ConawayIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/3/2016 - 2:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0566
    (SB0142)
Anne Arundel County - Tax Sale AdvertisingDelegate SophocleusIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and MeansTaxes - Property - Local (Q2)
HB0663
    (SB0580)
Constitution - Local Government - Legal NoticesDelegate Robinson, S.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Local Government - Generally (L6)
HB0666
    (SB0581)
Local Governments - Legal Notice RequirementsDelegate Robinson, S.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Local Government - Generally (L6)
HB0915
    (SB0837)
Tidal Fish License - Catching Crabs Using Trotline Gear - HolidaysDelegate JacobsIn the Senate - Conference Committee AppointedEnvironment and Transportation
2/26/2016 - 1:30 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHunting and Fishing (M2)
HB1460
    (SB0709)
Courts - Concealment of Public Hazards (Sunshine in Litigation Act)Delegate MoralesIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB1496Farmers' Rights ActDelegate Washington, M.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Commercial Law - Generally (I4)
HB1595Tidal Fish License - Catching Crabs Using Trotline Gear - HolidaysDelegate Howard, S.In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsHunting and Fishing (M2)
HB1636 / CH0314
    (SB1164)
Baltimore City - South Baltimore Gateway Community Impact District and Distribution of Local Impact GrantsDelegate ClippingerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 314Ways and Means
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationGaming (C7)
SB0142
    (HB0566)
Anne Arundel County - Tax Sale AdvertisingAnne Arundel County SenatorsIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; WithdrawnBudget and Taxation
2/3/2016 - 2:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property - Local (Q2)
SB0307 / CH0182Calvert County - Bonding AuthorityCalvert County SenatorsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 182Budget and Taxation
2/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/15/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Local Debt (Bond Bills) (B3)
SB0580
    (HB0663)
Constitution - Local Government - Legal NoticesSenator KingIn the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Local Government - Generally (L6)
SB0581
    (HB0666)
Local Governments - Legal Notice RequirementsSenator KingIn the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Local Government - Generally (L6)
SB0709
    (HB1460)
Courts - Concealment of Public Hazards (Sunshine in Litigation Act)Senator RamirezIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings
3/3/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0761Farmers' Rights ActSenator MadalenoIn the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Commercial Law - Generally (I4)
SB0764 / CH0229Education - Student Journalists - Freedom of Speech and Freedom of the PressSenator RaskinApproved by the Governor - Chapter 229Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0837
    (HB0915)
Crabs - Harvest Times - Trotlines and Crab PotsSenator WaughIn the House - Conference Committee AppointedEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/30/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
SB1164
    (HB1636 / CH0314)
Baltimore City - South Baltimore Gateway Community Benefits District and Distribution of Local Impact GrantsSenator FergusonIn the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (135-2)Budget and Taxation
3/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:05 P.M.