News Media

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 9

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0030Carroll County Board of Education - Budget - Public ReviewDelegate ShoemakerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and MeansEducation - Local Bills (F3)
HB0043Criminal Procedure - Cameras in the Courtroom - Criminal Sentencing HearingsDelegate ConawayIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
1/25/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0046Baltimore City - Criminal Procedure - Cameras in the Courtroom - Criminal Sentencing HearingsDelegate ConawayIn the House - Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
1/25/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0222
    (SB0528)
Courts - Concealment of Public Hazards (Sunshine in Litigation Act)Delegate MoralesIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB0927Criminal Law - Trespass, Petty Theft, and Disturbing the Peace - Alteration of PenaltiesDelegate MoralesIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB1008 / CH0098
    (SB1010 / CH0097)
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Publication of NoticesHarford County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 98Economic Matters
2/20/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB1300 / CH0419Charles County - Garbage Disposal Services - Provider DisplacementCharles County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 419Environment and Transportation
3/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Generally (L1)
SB0528
    (HB0222)
Courts - Concealment of Public Hazards (Sunshine in Litigation Act)Senator KelleyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB1010 / CH0097
    (HB1008 / CH0098)
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Publication of NoticesHarford County SenatorsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 97Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)

Denotes enacted legislation

November 28, 2017 1:17 P.M.