Nonresidents

2015 Regular Session

Total Bills: 21

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0072 / CH0489
    (SB0057)
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015SpeakerEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 489Appropriations
3/3/2015 - 3:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationOperating Budget (B1)
HB0090
    (SB0426 / CH0171)
Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - License Requirements MC 17-15Montgomery County DelegationVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Economic Matters
2/23/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0181
    (SB0069 / CH0005)
State Board of Pharmacy - Sterile Compounding - Compliance by Nonresident Pharmacies and Repeal of Permit RequirementDelegate HillVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Health and Government Operations
2/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHealth Occupations (J2)
HB0554 / CH0260Natural Resources - Nonresident Senior and Junior Hunting LicensesDelegate BeitzelApproved by the Governor - Chapter 260Environment and Transportation
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/31/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
HB0617 / CH0264Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Licenses, Salaries, Inspectors, and Bottle Clubs PG 307-15Prince George's County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 264Economic Matters
2/23/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0692College Savings Plans of Maryland - Maryland College Savings Account Plan - AuthorizationDelegate FrickIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; WithdrawnAppropriations
3/6/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
HB0735Public Safety - Regulated Firearms and Ammunition - Transport Through StateDelegate SzeligaIn the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0799 / CH0279Higher Education - Veterans and Dependents Nonresident Tuition - Compliance With Federal LawDelegate Young, P.Approved by the Governor - Chapter 279Ways and Means
3/5/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHigher Education (F2)
HB0847 / CH0341
    (SB0335 / CH0340)
Community Colleges - Victims of Human Trafficking - Exemption From Out-of-County and Out-of-Region FeesDelegate SimonaireApproved by the Governor - Chapter 341Ways and Means
3/13/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHigher Education (F2)
HB1068Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Marijuana Commission - Nonresident CardholdersDelegate Young, K.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB1074 / CH0295Complimentary Hunting License for Former Prisoners of War or Disabled Veterans - ReciprocityDelegate KipkeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 295Environment and Transportation
3/13/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/31/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
HB1105
    (SB0761 / CH0382)
Disabled Individuals - Task Force on the Maryland ABLE ProgramDelegate ZuckerVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Appropriations
3/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationDisabled (O3)
HB1289 / CH0308
    (SB0941)
Maryland Uniform Interstate Family Support Act - RevisionDelegate DumaisApproved by the Governor - Chapter 308Judiciary
4/2/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsFamily Law (D4)
SB0057
    (HB0072 / CH0489)
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015PresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Operating Budget (B1)
SB0069 / CH0005
    (HB0181)
State Board of Pharmacy - Sterile Compounding - Compliance by Nonresident Pharmacies and Repeal of Permit RequirementSenator ConwayApproved by the Governor - Chapter 5Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0201 / CH0331
    (HB0742)
State Board for the Certification of Residential Child Care Program Professionals - RevisionsSenator ConwayApproved by the Governor - Chapter 331Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0335 / CH0340
    (HB0847 / CH0341)
Community Colleges - Victims of Human Trafficking - Exemption From Out-of-County and Out-of-Region FeesSenator SimonaireApproved by the Governor - Chapter 340Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
SB0426 / CH0171
    (HB0090)
Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - License RequirementsSenator MadalenoApproved by the Governor - Chapter 171Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0761 / CH0382
    (HB1105)
Disabled Individuals - Task Force on the Maryland ABLE ProgramSenator FeldmanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 382Budget and Taxation
3/18/2015 - 1:30 p.m.
Appropriations
4/8/2015 - 2:00 p.m.
Disabled (O3)
SB0843University System of Maryland - Members of the Armed Forces - Financial AidSenator WaughIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsHigher Education (F2)
SB0941
    (HB1289 / CH0308)
Maryland Uniform Interstate Family Support Act - RevisionSenator RaskinIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsJudicial Proceedings
4/7/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsFamily Law (D4)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:42 P.M.