Nuisances

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 18

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0012
    (SB0019 / CH0164)
Crimes - Aiming Laser Pointer at AircraftDelegate AroraIn the Senate - Second Reading Passed with AmendmentsJudiciary
1/22/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0237
    (SB0331)
Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - License RenewalDelegate OaksIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0241
    (SB0163)
Commercial Fishing and Seafood Operations - Nuisance Actions - ExemptionDelegate JacobsIn the Senate - First Reading Judicial ProceedingsEnvironmental Matters
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsHunting and Fishing (M2)
HB0402
    (SB0320)
Frederick County - Authority to Ban Synthetic CannabinoidsFrederick County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Local Laws (L2)
HB0472 / CH0119Local Government ArticleSpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 119Environmental Matters
2/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Local Government - Generally (L6)
HB0676Montgomery County - Nuisances in Multidwelling Buildings - Private Right of Action MC 10-13Montgomery County DelegationIn the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0854 / CH0643
    (SB0479)
Criminal Procedure - Expungement of Records - Not Criminally ResponsibleDelegate DumaisApproved by the Governor - Chapter 643Judiciary
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0916 / CH0651
    (SB0791)
Juvenile Law - Dispositions - Placement GuidanceDelegate Valentino-SmithApproved by the Governor - Chapter 651Judiciary
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsJuvenile Law (E3)
HB1222Real Property - Landlord Defenses in Nuisance ActionsDelegate WeirIn the Senate - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB1507 / CH0690St. Mary's County - Property MaintenanceSt. Mary's County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 690Environmental Matters
3/22/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Local Laws (L2)
SB0019 / CH0164
    (HB0012)
Crimes - Aiming Laser Pointer at AircraftSenator JenningsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 164Judicial Proceedings
1/24/2013 - 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0028Real Property - Blighted Property - Nuisance AbatementSenator YoungIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersJudicial Proceedings
1/29/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
4/4/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB0163
    (HB0241)
Commercial Fishing and Seafood Operations - Nuisance Actions - ExemptionSenator PipkinIn the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
SB0320
    (HB0402)
Frederick County - Authority to Ban Synthetic CannabinoidsSenator BrinkleyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Local Laws (L2)
SB0331
    (HB0237)
Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - License RenewalSenator GladdenIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0479
    (HB0854 / CH0643)
Criminal Procedure - Expungement of Records - Not Criminally ResponsibleSenator GladdenIn the House - Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0791
    (HB0916 / CH0651)
Juvenile Law - Dispositions - Placement GuidanceSenator KelleyIn the House - Rereferred to JudiciaryJudicial Proceedings
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
JudiciaryJuvenile Law (E3)
SB0985Public Safety - Gas Pipelines - Public Nuisance SuitsSenator ZirkinIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:29 P.M.