Nursing Homes

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 13

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0326
    (SB0333)
Criminal Procedure - Vulnerable Adult Abuse RegistryDelegate GlennIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0472 / CH0119Local Government ArticleSpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 119Environmental Matters
2/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Local Government - Generally (L6)
HB0511Sales and Use Tax - Energy for Residential Use - ExemptionDelegate RosenbergIn the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Sales and Use (Q4)
HB1115 / CH0404
    (SB0593)
Health Occupations Boards - License Renewal, Investigation of Alleged Violations, and Immunity from LiabilityDelegate CullisonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 404Health and Government Operations
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Judicial Proceedings
Health Occupations (J2)
HB1159 / CH0670Electric Companies - Service Restoration - Special Medical Needs FacilitiesDelegate KramerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 670Economic Matters
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
HB1267Nursing Homes and Assisted Living Facilities - Sex OffendersDelegate KramerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Care Facilities and Regulation (J3)
HB1270Health Care Facilities and Pharmacies - Sale of Tobacco Products - ProhibitionDelegate FrushIn the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
3/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Care Facilities and Regulation (J3)
HB1290
    (SB0837)
Health Occupations Boards - Disciplinary Procedures - Prohibition on StaysDelegate FrankIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
HB1372 / CH0430
    (SB0934)
Prior Authorizations of State Debt to Fund Capital Projects - AlterationsDelegate JonesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 430Appropriations
3/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationPrior Authorizations (B4)
SB0333
    (HB0326)
Criminal Procedure - Vulnerable Adult Abuse RegistrySenator GladdenIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0593
    (HB1115 / CH0404)
Health Occupations Boards - License Renewal, Investigation of Alleged Violations, and Immunity from LiabilitySenator MontgomeryVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
Health and Government Operations
4/3/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0837
    (HB1290)
Health Occupations Boards - Disciplinary Procedures - Prohibition on StaysSenator YoungIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government OperationsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/3/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0934
    (HB1372 / CH0430)
Prior Authorizations of State Debt to Fund Capital Projects - AlterationsSenator DeGrangeIn the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/15/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Prior Authorizations (B4)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:29 P.M.