Orphans' Court

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 8

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0225 / CH0807
    (SB0173 / CH0808)
Kent County - Orphans' Court Judges - CompensationDelegate JacobsEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 807Health and Government Operations
2/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsEstates and Trusts (N2)
HB0550 / CH0819Charles County - Orphans' Court Judges - SalaryCharles County DelegationEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 819Health and Government Operations
2/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Estates and Trusts (N2)
HB0720 / CH0167
    (SB0486 / CH0168)
Allegany County - Orphans' Court Judges - Pension FormulaAllegany County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 167Appropriations
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsEstates and Trusts (N2)
HB0777
    (SB0649)
Estates and Trusts - Elective Share of Surviving SpouseDelegate DumaisIn the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
2/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Estates and Trusts (N2)
HB1247 / CH0838Anne Arundel County – Orphans’ Court Judges – CompensationAnne Arundel County DelegationEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 838Health and Government Operations
2/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/3/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Courts and Court Personnel - Local (D2)
SB0173 / CH0808
    (HB0225 / CH0807)
Kent County - Orphans' Court Judges - CompensationSenator HersheyEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 808Judicial Proceedings
1/25/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Estates and Trusts (N2)
SB0486 / CH0168
    (HB0720 / CH0167)
Allegany County - Orphans' Court Judges - Pension FormulaSenator EdwardsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 168Judicial Proceedings
2/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/20/2018 - 1:15 p.m.
Estates and Trusts (N2)
SB0649
    (HB0777)
Estates and Trusts - Elective Share of Surviving SpouseSenator KelleyIn the House - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Estates and Trusts (N2)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 31, 2018 1:03 P.M.