Parole and Probation

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 30

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0065Criminal Procedure - Domestic Violence - Active Electronic Monitoring - Pretrial Release and ProbationDelegate AngelIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
1/18/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0100
    (SB0199)
Criminal Law - Violent Offenders - Penalties (Accountability for Violent Criminals Act of 2018)SpeakerIn the House - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0212
    (SB1038 / CH0238)
Criminal Law – Animal Cruelty – Sentencing ConditionsDelegate MoonVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judiciary
2/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0247 / CH0422
    (SB0963)
Criminal Procedure - Victim Services Unit - Victims' CompensationChair, Judiciary CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 422Judiciary
1/30/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0394
    (SB0424 / CH0505)
Driver’s Licenses – Learner’s Permits – Minimum DurationDelegate DumaisVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Environment and Transportation
2/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsVehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB0678Criminal Law - Sentencing - Subsequent Offenders (Career Criminal Truth in Sentencing Act)Delegate BuckelIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0846
    (SB0249)
Inmates - Life Imprisonment - Parole ReformDelegate QueenIn the House - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0887Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Murder of Specific Individuals or Mass MurderDelegate ShoemakerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0890Correctional Services - Parole Eligibility - Violent Crime Involving a FirearmDelegate MaloneIn the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0963Correctional Services - Eligibility for Parole - Violent CrimeDelegate MaloneIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1166
    (SB0617)
Criminal Procedure – Sentencing – Primary CaretakerDelegate HaynesIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1202
    (SB0324 / CH0317)
Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages - Serving Underage Individuals - PenaltiesDelegate ParrottIn the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEconomic Matters
2/19/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB1391Driving Under the Influence of Alcohol - Subsequent Offenders - Mandatory Ignition InterlockDelegate CilibertiIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
3/2/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Drunk Driving (R3)
HB1397Criminal Procedure – Pretrial Release – Defendant on ParoleDelegate HornbergerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1418Criminal Law - Distribution of Fentanyl - PenaltiesDelegate McComasIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB1524
    (SB1134)
Juvenile Justice Coordinating CouncilDelegate ClippingerIn the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)Judiciary
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsJuvenile Law (E3)
HB1570Criminal Law - Assault on an Elder Adult - PenaltiesDelegate Howard, S.In the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB1732Public Safety - Youth Crime Prevention and Diversion Parole Fund - EstablishmentDelegate HaynesIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsPublic Safety (E4)
HB1740
    (SB1179)
Baltimore City - Law Enforcement Officers' Bill of Rights - Hearing BoardDelegate AndersonIn the House - Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
4/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0101 / CH0143Criminal Law – Crimes of Violence, Expungement, and Drug TreatmentSenator NormanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 143Judicial Proceedings
1/17/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0199
    (HB0100)
Criminal Law - Violent Offenders - Penalties (Accountability for Violent Criminals Act of 2018)PresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
1/30/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0225Correctional Services – Eligibility for Parole – Life ImprisonmentSenator HoughIn the Senate - Hearing 2/01 at 2:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/1/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0249
    (HB0846)
Inmates - Life Imprisonment - Parole ReformSenator KelleyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/01 at 2:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/1/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0324 / CH0317
    (HB1202)
Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages - Serving Underage Individuals - PenaltiesWashington County SenatorsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 317Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0424 / CH0505
    (HB0394)
Driver’s Licenses – Learner’s Permits – Minimum DurationSenator ZirkinApproved by the Governor - Chapter 505Judicial Proceedings
2/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and TransportationVehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
SB0617
    (HB1166)
Criminal Procedure - Sentencing - Primary CaretakerSenator RobinsonIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0816Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Law Enforcement Officers and First RespondersSenator SallingIn the Senate - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0963
    (HB0247 / CH0422)
Criminal Procedure - Victim Services Unit - Victims' CompensationSenator HoughIn the Senate - Conference Committee AppointedJudicial Proceedings
2/28/2018 - 3:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB1038 / CH0238
    (HB0212)
Criminal Law – Animal Cruelty – Sentencing ConditionsSenator SmithApproved by the Governor - Chapter 238Judicial Proceedings
2/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/3/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB1179
    (HB1740)
Baltimore City - Law Enforcement Officers' Bill of Rights - Hearing BoardSenator ConwayIn the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 29, 2018 3:55 P.M.