Paternity

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 5

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0715
    (SB0620)
Family Law - Denial of Paternity, Custody, and VisitationDelegate DumaisIn the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB1099
    (SB0792)
Maryland Collaborative Reproduction ActDelegate DumaisIn the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0178Family Law - Blood or Genetic Test Results - Legal Finding of PaternityChair, Judicial Proceedings CommitteeIn the House - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0620
    (HB0715)
Family Law - Denial of Paternity, Custody, and VisitationSenator RaskinIn the House - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0792
    (HB1099)
Maryland Collaborative Reproduction ActSenator KelleyIn the House - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)

December 8, 2015 2:29 P.M.