Pharmacists and Pharmacies

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 24

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0179 / CH0256
    (SB0401 / CH0255)
Pharmacists - Administration of Vaccinations - Expanded Authority and Reporting RequirementsDelegate HubbardApproved by the Governor - Chapter 256Health and Government Operations
1/31/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHealth Occupations (J2)
HB0206
    (SB0237 / CH0211)
Health Occupations - Sunset Extension and Program EvaluationSpeakerVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Health and Government Operations
1/31/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHealth Occupations (J2)
HB0302Maryland Medical Marijuana ActDelegate GlennIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/8/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/8/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0591 / CH0621
    (SB0595 / CH0298)
State Board of Pharmacy - Wholesale Distribution - PharmaciesDelegate MorhaimApproved by the Governor - Chapter 621Health and Government Operations
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHealth Occupations (J2)
HB0716 / CH0509
    (SB0617 / CH0508)
Drug Therapy Management - Physician-Pharmacist AgreementsDelegate TarrantApproved by the Governor - Chapter 509Health and Government Operations
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Health Maintenance Organizations (J4)
HB0736
    (SB0928)
Health Insurance - Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Specialty DrugsDelegate KipkeIn the House - Referred to interim study by Health and Government OperationsHealth and Government Operations
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
HB0783State Board of Pharmacy - Jurisdiction over Dentists Who Prepare and Dispense Dental Products and AntibioticsDelegate ReznikIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
HB0868 / CH0393
    (SB0761)
Health Occupations - State Board of Pharmacy - Waivers - Pharmacies That Only Dispense DevicesDelegate MurphyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 393Health and Government Operations
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHealth Occupations (J2)
HB0890
    (SB0610 / CH0299)
Health - Overdose Response Program - EstablishmentDelegate BromwellVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Health and Government Operations
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
Public Health (J1)
HB0908Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Prescription Drugs - Maximum Allowable Cost PricesDelegate KachIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
HB0986 / CH0397
    (SB0896)
State Board of Pharmacy - Sterile Compounding - PermitsDelegate HammenApproved by the Governor - Chapter 397Health and Government Operations
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHealth Occupations (J2)
HB1100Maryland Compassionate Care ActDelegate MorhaimIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/8/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/8/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB1270Health Care Facilities and Pharmacies - Sale of Tobacco Products - ProhibitionDelegate FrushIn the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
3/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Care Facilities and Regulation (J3)
HB1366Alcoholic Beverages - Class CS Chain Store LicensesDelegate BarnesIn the House - Rereferred to Economic MattersEconomic MattersAlcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills (A1)
SB0237 / CH0211
    (HB0206)
Health Occupations - Sunset Extension and Program EvaluationPresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 211Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0401 / CH0255
    (HB0179 / CH0256)
Pharmacists - Administration of Vaccinations - Expanded Authority and Reporting RequirementsSenator DysonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 255Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/4/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0515State Board of Pharmacy - Jurisdiction over Dentists Who Prepare and Dispense Dental Products and AntibioticsSenator MiddletonIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0595 / CH0298
    (HB0591 / CH0621)
State Board of Pharmacy - Wholesale Distribution - PharmaciesSenator MontgomeryApproved by the Governor - Chapter 298Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/4/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0610 / CH0299
    (HB0890)
Health - Overdose Response Program - EstablishmentSenator KlausmeierApproved by the Governor - Chapter 299Finance
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
Health and Government Operations
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0617 / CH0508
    (HB0716 / CH0509)
Drug Therapy Management - Physician-Pharmacist AgreementsSenator KlausmeierApproved by the Governor - Chapter 508Finance
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Health and Government Operations
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Maintenance Organizations (J4)
SB0761
    (HB0868 / CH0393)
Health Occupations - State Board of Pharmacy - Waivers - Pharmacies That Only Dispense DevicesSenator MontgomeryVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/4/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0781Pharmacists - Biosimilar Biological Products - SubstitutionsSenator ConwayIn the House - Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/4/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0896
    (HB0986 / CH0397)
State Board of Pharmacy - Sterile Compounding - PermitsSenator ConwayIn the House - Rereferred to Health and Government OperationsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government OperationsHealth Occupations (J2)
SB0928
    (HB0736)
Health Insurance - Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Specialty DrugsSenator PughIn the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)Finance
3/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Insurance - Health (C3)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:29 P.M.