Photography

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 9

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0043 / CH0583Criminal Law - Harassment - Revenge PornDelegate SimmonsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 583Judiciary
1/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0064Criminal Law - Intentional Disclosure of Sexually Explicit Image of Another Person Without ConsentDelegate CardinIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
1/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0204Crimes - Extortion of Sexually Explicit ImagesDelegate McDermottIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
1/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0289
    (SB0699 / CH0192)
Automatic License Plate Readers and Captured Plate Data - Authorized UsesDelegate CarrIn the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
2/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings Public Safety (E4)
HB0336Criminal Law - Coercion to Provide Sexually Explicit Images - PenaltiesCharles County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
2/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0373Criminal Procedure - Animal Abuser RegistrationDelegate McConkeyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0491Criminal Law - Intentionally Causing Emotional Distress - Distribution of Images or VideoDelegate FrickIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0699 / CH0192
    (HB0289)
Automatic License Plate Readers and Captured Plate Data - Authorized UsesSenator ShankApproved by the Governor - Chapter 192Judicial Proceedings
3/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0912Maryland Animal Abuse RegistrySenator StoneIn the Senate - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:35 P.M.