Physical Therapists

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 6

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0395
    (SB0702)
Health Care Malpractice Claims - Definition of "Health Care Provider"Delegate DumaisIn the House - Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB0401 / CH0598
    (SB0381)
Health Occupations - Chiropractors, Massage Therapists, Physical Therapists, and Physical Therapist Assistants - Criminal History Records Checks RequiredDelegate CullisonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 598Health and Government Operations
2/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Health Occupations (J2)
HB1456 / CH0457Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Board of Review - JurisdictionChair, Health and Government Operations CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 457Health and Government Operations
3/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0052
    (HB1433)
Task Force to Study Services and Resources Provided by the Department of Veterans AffairsSenator BensonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government OperationsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/23/2014 - 2:45 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0381
    (HB0401 / CH0598)
Health Occupations - Chiropractors, Massage Therapists, Physical Therapists, and Physical Therapist Assistants - Criminal History Records Checks RequiredSenator ConwayIn the House - Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0702
    (HB0395)
Health Care Malpractice Claims - Definition of "Health Care Provider"Senator PughIn the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:35 P.M.