Police Training Commission

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 19

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0024 / CH0758Public Safety - Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission Fund - EstablishmentDelegate JacksonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 758Appropriations
2/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
Public Safety (E4)
HB0190 / CH0671Public Safety - Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission - Psychological Consultation and EvaluationChair, Judiciary CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 671Judiciary
1/30/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0265Public Safety - Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission - Medical Cannabis Program TrainingDelegate GrammerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
1/30/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0522
    (SB0582)
Public Safety - Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission - Sexual Assault Investigation TrainingDelegate QueenIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0805Task Force on Police Staffing Levels in Baltimore CityDelegate MaloneIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0920
    (SB0705)
Public Safety - SWAT Team Activation and Deployment - ReportsDelegate MieleIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0944First Responders - Mandatory Autism TrainingDelegate ShoemakerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Disabled (O3)
HB1169
    (SB0343)
Baltimore City - Office of State's Attorney - Authority to Appoint Criminal InvestigatorsDelegate AndersonIn the Senate - First Reading Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1175Public Safety - National Railroad Passenger Corporation (AMTRAK) Police ForceDelegate ClusterIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB1526
    (SB0344)
Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission - Police Officer Certification - Eligibility (Freedom to Serve Act)Delegate SanchezIn the Senate - First Reading Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsPublic Safety (E4)
HB1638
    (SB0788)
Public Information Act - RevisionsDelegate SydnorIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
State Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
HB1803
    (SB1241)
Baltimore City - Independent Institutions of Higher Education - Police ForceDelegate GlennIn the House - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0343
    (HB1169)
Baltimore City - Office of State's Attorney - Authority to Appoint Criminal InvestigatorsSenator ConwayIn the Senate - Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0344
    (HB1526)
Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission - Police Officer Certification - Eligibility (Freedom to Serve Act)Senator KaganIn the Senate - Hearing 2/01 at 2:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/1/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0582
    (HB0522)
Public Safety - Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission - Sexual Assault Investigation TrainingSenator RamirezIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0705
    (HB0920)
Public Safety - SWAT Team Activation and Deployment - ReportsSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0788
    (HB1638)
Public Information Act - RevisionsSenator KaganIn the Senate - Recommitted to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs (Senator Conway)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
SB1013First Responders - Mandatory Autism TrainingSenator ReadyIn the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Disabled (O3)
SB1241
    (HB1803)
Baltimore City - Independent Institutions of Higher Education - Police ForceSenator ConwayIn the Senate - Hearing canceledJudicial Proceedings
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Public Safety (E4)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 18, 2018 4:07 P.M.