Political Committees

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 8

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0260Campaign Finance - Disclosure of Contributions and Expenditures - Preelection PeriodDelegate CarrIn the House - Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
1/30/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0383Campaign Finance Entities - Solicitation Disclosures - ExpendituresDelegate EbersoleIn the House - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0630 / CH0273
    (SB0289 / CH0272)
Frederick County – Ethics and Campaign Activity – Governing Body, County Board and Commission Members, and Board of License CommissionersFrederick County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 273Environment and Transportation
2/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsElections (G1)
HB0768Election Law - Online Political Advertisements and Campaign Material - DisclosureDelegate RosenbergIn the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0981 / CH0834
    (SB0875 / CH0833)
Online Electioneering Transparency and Accountability ActDelegate Washington, A.Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 834Ways and Means
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsElections (G1)
SB0289 / CH0272
    (HB0630 / CH0273)
Frederick County - Ethics and Campaign Activity - Governing Body, County Board and Commission Members, and Board of License CommissionersSenator HoughApproved by the Governor - Chapter 272Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/30/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
Environment and TransportationElections (G1)
SB0426Election Laws - Loans to a Campaign Finance EntitySenator BatesIn the Senate - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB0875 / CH0833
    (HB0981 / CH0834)
Online Electioneering Transparency and Accountability ActSenator ZuckerEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 833Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 31, 2018 1:02 P.M.