Political Parties

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 13

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0280
    (SB1061)
Ballot Access - Voter Registration - Affiliating With a PartyDelegate TarlauIn the House - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0477Potomac Compact for Fair RepresentationDelegate CarrIn the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations
2/26/2018 - 3:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0770Courts - Appointments to Vacant Offices by the Judiciary - Same Party as PredecessorDelegate HornbergerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide (D1)
HB1444Election Law - Primary Elections - Voters Not Affiliated With a Political PartyDelegate FlanaganIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and MeansWays and Means
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB1717 / CH0552State Government - Protection of Information - Voter Registration NumbersDelegate WilkinsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 552Ways and Means
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsElections (G1)
HB1725Election Law - Simultaneous Candidacy for Party and Public OfficeDelegate JalisiIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsElections (G1)
SB0130Election of Circuit Court Judges - Nonpartisan ElectionsSenator ZirkinIn the Senate - Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
1/25/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide (D1)
SB0190Election Law - International Election ObserversSenator KaganIn the Senate - Recommitted to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs (Senator Conway)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/30/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB0246State Personnel - Maryland Hatch ActSenator WaughIn the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Personnel (P4)
SB0256
    (HB0662)
Presidential Candidate Tax Transparency ActSenator PinskyIn the House - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/30/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB0374Public Funding and Small Donor Act for General Assembly ElectionsSenator PinskyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB0940Election Law - Polling Places - Election JudgesSenator BrochinIn the House - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB1061
    (HB0280)
Ballot Access - Voter Registration - Affiliating With a PartySenator KaganIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 11, 2018 4:29 P.M.