Pollution

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 31

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0044Environment - Maryland Clean Water Fund - UsesDelegate VitaleIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
2/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB0106
    (SB0391)
Sustainable Growth and Agricultural Preservation Act of 2012 - RepealDelegate McDermottIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
2/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB0434
    (SB0317)
Frederick County - Stormwater Management - Watershed Protection and Restoration Program - ExemptionFrederick County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; WithdrawnEnvironmental MattersEnvironment (M3)
HB0444
    (SB0873)
Vehicle Emissions Inspection Program - Alternate Tests and InspectionsDelegate ImpallariaIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
2/19/2013 - 1:15 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections (R6)
HB0561 / CH0315
    (SB0748 / CH0314)
Agriculture - Nutrient Management - Limiting ApplicabilityDelegate HubbardApproved by the Governor - Chapter 315Environmental Matters
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsAgriculture (M4)
HB0694Environment - Stormwater Management - Exemption from Watershed Protection and Restoration ProgramDelegate KrebsIn the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB0799
    (SB0289)
Environment - Water Pollution Control - PenaltyDelegate FrushIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
2/22/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB0827Environment - Water Supply and Wastewater Infrastructure - FundDelegate HuckerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
2/22/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB0837Family Farm - Prevailing Party - Attorney's Fees and ExpensesDelegate McDermottIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB1086
    (SB0576)
Community Cleanup and Greening Act of 2013Delegate Washington, M.In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. (Environmental Matters)Environmental Matters
3/8/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB1134Task Force to Study the Impact of the Heat Island Effect on MarylandDelegate WaldstreicherIn the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB1208Bay Restoration Fee - Exemption - On-Site Sewage Disposal System Using Best Available TechnologySenator HersheyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB1243Environment - Water Pollution Control - PenaltiesDelegate JacobsIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB1274Maryland Hydraulic Fracturing Moratorium and Right to Know Act of 2013Delegate MizeurIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; WithdrawnEnvironmental Matters
3/8/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB1295Procurement - State Funds - Energy Efficient Outdoor Lighting FixturesDelegate CarrIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
HB1392
    (SB0943)
Vehicle Emissions Inspection Program - Decentralization - StudyDelegate O'DonnellIn the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections (R6)
HB1515 / CH0429
    (SB1054)
Transportation Infrastructure Investment Act of 2013SpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 429Ways and Means
3/15/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Transportation (Q5)
SB0289
    (HB0799)
Environment - Water Pollution Control - PenaltySenator SimonaireIn the Senate - Recommitted to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs (Senator Conway)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB0302 / CH0222Environment - Water Pollution Control - ReportingSenator GlassmanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 222Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB0317
    (HB0434)
Frederick County - Stormwater Management - Watershed Protection and Restoration Program - ExemptionSenator BrinkleyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB0391
    (HB0106)
Sustainable Growth and Agricultural Preservation Act of 2012 - RepealSenator PipkinIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB0575 / CH0502Environment - Maryland Clean Water Fund - Annual ReportSenator SimonaireApproved by the Governor - Chapter 502Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
4/3/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB0576
    (HB1086)
Community Cleanup and Greening Act of 2013Senator RaskinIn the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB0739Agriculture - Nutrient Management Plans - Fertility Index Value Soil TestingSenator PinskyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
4/3/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Agriculture (M4)
SB0748 / CH0314
    (HB0561 / CH0315)
Agriculture - Nutrient Management - Limiting ApplicabilitySenator MiddletonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 314Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
4/3/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Agriculture (M4)
SB0854 / CH0568Environment - Gas and Oil Drilling - Financial AssuranceSenator EdwardsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 568Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
4/3/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB0873
    (HB0444)
Vehicle Emissions Inspection Program - Alternate Tests and InspectionsSenator GlassmanIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial ProceedingsVehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections (R6)
SB0943
    (HB1392)
Vehicle Emissions Inspection Program - Decentralization - StudySenator ShankIn the Senate - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections (R6)
SB0979Environment - Watershed Implementation Plan - Conowingo Dam Environmental AssessmentSenator PipkinIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB1029 / CH0339Maryland Agricultural Certainty ProgramSenator MiddletonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 339Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Agriculture (M4)
SB1054
    (HB1515 / CH0429)
Transportation Infrastructure Investment Act of 2013PresidentIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRulesTaxes - Transportation (Q5)

Denotes enacted legislation

October 30, 2013 7:44 A.M.