Pollution

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 12

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0011 / CH0697Vehicle Laws - Causing Diesel Emissions to Discharge Onto Another - ProhibitionDelegate LamApproved by the Governor - Chapter 697Environment and Transportation
1/26/2017 - 2:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB0281
    (SB0266)
Environment - On-Site Sewage Disposal Systems - Best Available Technology for Nitrogen Removal - ProhibitionDelegate LaffertyIn the House - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB0384 / CH0369
    (SB0343 / CH0368)
Bay Restoration Fund - Eligible Costs - ExpansionDelegate AdamsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 369Environment and Transportation
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEnvironment (M3)
HB0845Education - Public School Indoor Air QualityDelegate Miller, W.In the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1282Public Service Commission - Out-of-State Carbon Pollution Program - StudyDelegate LisantiIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic MattersUtility Regulation (C5)
SB0158 / CH0390Maryland Oil Disaster Containment, Clean-Up and Contingency Fund and Oil Contaminated Site Environmental Cleanup FundSenator ConwayApproved by the Governor - Chapter 390Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/31/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB0266
    (HB0281)
Environment - On-Site Sewage Disposal Systems - Best Available Technology for Nitrogen RemovalSenator ConwayIn the House - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/31/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB0277Motor Vehicle Emissions Inspection Program - Prohibition on Suspension or Revocation of RegistrationSenator MadalenoIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings
2/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections (R6)
SB0343 / CH0368
    (HB0384 / CH0369)
Bay Restoration Fund - Eligible Costs - ExpansionSenator EckardtApproved by the Governor - Chapter 368Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB0393 / CH0363Clean Cars Act of 2017Senator MannoApproved by the Governor - Chapter 363Budget and Taxation
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and TransportationTaxes - Transportation (Q5)
SB0773Community Healthy Air ActSenator MadalenoIn the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB0776Environment - On-Site Sewage Disposal Systems - Nonprofit CampgroundsSenator JenningsIn the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)

Denotes enacted legislation

June 7, 2017 9:42 A.M.