Pollution

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 10

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0026
    (SB0133)
Community Healthy Air ActDelegate Lewis, R.In the House - Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)Environment and Transportation
2/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
Environment (M3)
HB0161
    (SB0187 / CH0010)
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2018SpeakerIn the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
3/2/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Operating Budget (B1)
HB0230 / CH0768
    (SB0290 / CH0008)
Regional Greenhouse Gas Initiative - Withdrawal - Legislative Approval Required (Regional Greenhouse Gas Initiative Extension Act)Delegate KormanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 768Economic Matters
2/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEnvironment (M3)
HB0458Environment – Sale or Transfer of Home With On–Site Sewage Disposal System – Nitrogen Removal Technology RequirementDelegate LaffertyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and Transportation
2/23/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB0939Regional Carbon Cost Collection InitiativeDelegate KramerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/5/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB1055State Finance and Procurement - Chesapeake Bay Watershed States - Expenses and Contracts (Quit Polluting My Bay Act of 2018)Delegate KramerIn the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
2/23/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
HB1826Environment - Water Pollution Control - Water Quality CertificationDelegate RobinsonIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsEnvironment (M3)
SB0133
    (HB0026)
Community Healthy Air ActSenator MadalenoIn the Senate - Hearing 1/24 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/24/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB0187 / CH0010
    (HB0161)
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2018PresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 10Budget and Taxation
2/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
AppropriationsOperating Budget (B1)
SB0290 / CH0008
    (HB0230 / CH0768)
Regional Greenhouse Gas Initiative - Withdrawal - Legislative Approval Required (Regional Greenhouse Gas Initiative Extension Act)Senator PinskyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 8Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersEnvironment (M3)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 21, 2018 10:41 A.M.