Pornography

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 3

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0027Correctional Services - Child Pornography Offenders - Diminution Credits and ParoleDelegate ClusterIn the House - Hearing 1/22 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
1/22/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0396 / CH0369
    (SB1052)
Criminal Law - Misuse of Interactive Computer Service (Grace's Law)Delegate CardinApproved by the Governor - Chapter 369Judiciary
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB1052
    (HB0396 / CH0369)
Criminal Law - Misuse of Interactive Computer Service (Grace's Law)Senator KittlemanIn the House - Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:30 P.M.