Power of Attorney

2015 Regular Session

Total Bills: 4

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0531
    (SB0429)
Estates and Trusts - Maryland Fiduciary Access to Digital Assets ActDelegate KramerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government OperationsHealth and Government Operations
2/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Estates and Trusts (N2)
HB1105
    (SB0761 / CH0382)
Disabled Individuals - Task Force on the Maryland ABLE ProgramDelegate ZuckerVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Appropriations
3/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationDisabled (O3)
SB0429
    (HB0531)
Estates and Trusts - Maryland Fiduciary Access to Digital Assets ActSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Estates and Trusts (N2)
SB0761 / CH0382
    (HB1105)
Disabled Individuals - Task Force on the Maryland ABLE ProgramSenator FeldmanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 382Budget and Taxation
3/18/2015 - 1:30 p.m.
Appropriations
4/8/2015 - 2:00 p.m.
Disabled (O3)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:42 P.M.