Power Plants

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 8

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0385 / CH0435
    (SB0027 / CH0434)
Chesapeake Conservation Corps Program - Funding ExtensionDelegate Robinson, S.Approved by the Governor - Chapter 435Environmental Matters
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsNatural Resources - Generally (M1)
HB0472 / CH0119Local Government ArticleSpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 119Environmental Matters
2/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Local Government - Generally (L6)
HB0504
    (SB0370 / CH0463)
Garrett County - County Commissioners - Industrial Wind Energy Conversion SystemsDelegate BeitzelIn the House - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
3/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Local Laws (L2)
HB1187
    (SB0887 / CH0572)
Public Utilities - Solar Photovoltaic SystemsDelegate HuckerIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesEconomic Matters
3/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
RulesUtility Regulation (C5)
HB1451Creation of a State Debt - Washington County - Municipal Electric Light Plant ProjectDelegate DonoghueIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/9/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB1455 / CH0687Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Property Tax - Payment in Lieu of Taxes Agreement MC/PG 118-13Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 687Ways and Means
3/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/2/2013 - 1:30 p.m.
Bi-County Agencies (L5)
SB0370 / CH0463
    (HB0504)
Garrett County - County Commissioners - Industrial Wind Energy Conversion SystemsSenator EdwardsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 463Finance
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersCounties - Local Laws (L2)
SB0887 / CH0572
    (HB1187)
Public Utilities - Solar Photovoltaic SystemsSenator GaragiolaApproved by the Governor - Chapter 572Finance
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersUtility Regulation (C5)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:30 P.M.