Pregnancy

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 17

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0027 / CH0212
    (SB0656)
Correctional Services - Healthy Births for Incarcerated Women ActDelegate Washington, M.Approved by the Governor - Chapter 212Judiciary
1/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings Public Safety (E4)
HB0235Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Law Enforcement Officers and Correctional OfficersDelegate Kelly, K.In the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0236
    (SB0208)
Maryland Collaborative Reproduction ActDelegate DumaisIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
1/30/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB0283
    (SB0034)
Pain-Capable Unborn Child Protection ActDelegate ParrottIn the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/10/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0792
    (SB0695)
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Dental Services for Postpartum Women - CoverageDelegate KellyIn the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
2/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB1026 / CH0334
    (SB0737 / CH0333)
Labor and Employment - Unpaid Parental Leave - Birth or Adoption of a ChildDelegate KellyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 334Economic Matters
2/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB1211State Board of Nursing - Midwives - Licensing and RegulationDelegate KellyIn the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
HB1324Maryland Youth Employment Act of 2014Delegate Washington, A.In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/7/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB1337
    (SB0798)
Maryland No-Fault Birth Injury FundDelegate MorhaimIn the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)Health and Government Operations
3/10/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0034
    (HB0283)
Pain-Capable Unborn Child Protection ActSenator ReillyIn the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0085Health - Medical Procedures - Ultrasound OptionsSenator SimonaireIn the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0208
    (HB0236)
Maryland Collaborative Reproduction ActSenator KelleyIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsJudicial Proceedings
1/30/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations Family Law (D4)
SB0656
    (HB0027 / CH0212)
Correctional Services - Healthy Births for Incarcerated Women ActSenator RaskinIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsJudicial Proceedings
3/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations Public Safety (E4)
SB0695
    (HB0792)
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Dental Services for Postpartum Women - CoverageSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0737 / CH0333
    (HB1026 / CH0334)
Labor and Employment - Unpaid Parental Leave - Birth or Adoption of a ChildSenator PughApproved by the Governor - Chapter 333Finance
3/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB0798
    (HB1337)
Maryland No-Fault Birth Injury FundSenator PughIn the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0944Family Law - Controlled Dangerous Substance Use During Pregnancy and Substance-Exposed Newborns - ReportingSenator ShankIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:35 P.M.