Pretrial Detention or Release

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 15

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0476
    (SB0720)
Criminal Procedure - Alien Defendants - Nullity of Bail BondsDelegate SimmonsIn the Senate - First Reading Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0596 / CH0622
    (SB0419)
Civil Actions - Interrogatories or Examination in Aid of Enforcement - Procedure After Arrest for Failure to Appear to Show CauseDelegate ClippingerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 622Judiciary
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCivil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB0777
    (SB0505 / CH0487)
Criminal Procedure - Bail Bonds - Cash BailDelegate Kelly, K.Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judiciary
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0792 / CH0059
    (SB0507 / CH0058)
Correctional Facilities - Inmate Programs in Washington County - Payment of Child SupportWashington County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 59Judiciary
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsPublic Safety (E4)
HB0848
    (SB0454)
Juveniles - Confinement in Juvenile FacilitiesDelegate RosenbergIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Juvenile Law (E3)
HB1109Criminal Procedure - Defendants Held on No Bail Status - Comprehensive Risk AssessmentDelegate CarterIn the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1112
    (SB0556)
Criminal Procedure - Persons Committed as Not Criminally Responsible - ReleaseDelegate MitchellIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1259Crimes - Elder Abuse or Neglect - Restrictions on Pretrial ReleaseDelegate GlennIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciaryCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0419
    (HB0596 / CH0622)
Civil Actions - Examination in Aid of Enforcement - Procedure After Arrest for Failure to AppearSenator FroshIn the House - Conference Committee AppointedJudicial Proceedings
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0454
    (HB0848)
Juveniles - Confinement in Juvenile FacilitiesSenator GladdenIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Juvenile Law (E3)
SB0505 / CH0487
    (HB0777)
Criminal Procedure - Bail Bonds - Cash BailSenator ZirkinApproved by the Governor - Chapter 487Judicial Proceedings
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0507 / CH0058
    (HB0792 / CH0059)
Correctional Facilities - Inmate Programs in Washington County - Payment of Child SupportSenator ShankApproved by the Governor - Chapter 58Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0556
    (HB1112)
Criminal Procedure - Persons Committed as Not Criminally Responsible - ReleaseSenator StoneIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0720
    (HB0476)
Criminal Procedure - Alien Defendants - Nullity of Bail BondsSenator RamirezIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB1069Criminal Procedure - Issuance of Summonses and Arrest Warrants and Restrictions on Pretrial ReleaseSenator ShankIn the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial ProceedingsJudicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:30 P.M.