Privatization

2015 Regular Session

Total Bills: 18

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0033Housing and Community Development - Community Development Projects and Public Purpose ProjectsDelegate VitaleIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB0066Human Services - No Wrong Door Pilot ProgramDelegate RosenbergIn the House - Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
2/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Social Services - Generally (O1)
HB0104Montgomery County - Transit Authority MC 24-15Montgomery County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and Transportation
Ways and Means
Counties - Local Laws (L2)
HB0119
    (SB0708)
Construction Contracts - Change Orders (State Procurement Change Order Fairness Act)Delegate MorhaimIn the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)Health and Government Operations
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsState Government - Procurement (P2)
HB0538
    (SB0075)
Task Force to Study a Program for Interest-Free Loans to STEM College Students in MarylandDelegate SteinIn the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/5/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
HB0546Maryland Transit Administration Oversight and Planning BoardDelegate LiermanIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
HB0844 / CH0106Maryland Small Business Development Financing Authority - Small Business Surety Bond ProgramDelegate BranchApproved by the Governor - Chapter 106Economic Matters
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB0916Economic Development - Community Revitalization and Improvement ZonesDelegate Wilson, B.In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/13/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Local Government - Generally (L6)
HB0936 / CH0290Public-Private Partnership Agreements - Construction Contracts - Security RequirementsDelegate JonesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 290Environment and Transportation
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Budget and Taxation
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB0943 / CH0141
    (SB0776)
Economic Competitiveness and Commerce - RestructuringSpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 141Economic Matters
3/9/2015 - 2:00 p.m.
FinanceEconomic and Community Development (C8)
HB0986State Government - Maryland Commission on Efficiency in GovernmentDelegate BromwellIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB1213
    (SB0662 / CH0191)
State Finance and Procurement - One Maryland Blue Ribbon CommissionDelegate MieleIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsState Government - Procurement (P2)
SB0075
    (HB0538)
Task Force to Study a Program for Interest-Free Loans to STEM College Students in MarylandSenator FeldmanIn the House - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/4/2015 - 2:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
SB0453Public-Private Partnership Agreements - Construction Contracts - Security RequirementsSenator GuzzoneVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Budget and Taxation
3/18/2015 - 1:30 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/31/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB0662 / CH0191
    (HB1213)
State Finance and Procurement - One Maryland Blue Ribbon CommissionSenator ReadyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 191Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
SB0683State Board of Education - Next Generation Schools - EstablishedSenator FergusonIn the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0708
    (HB0119)
Construction Contracts - Change Orders (State Procurement Change Order Fairness Act)Senator ConwayIn the Senate - Third Reading Passed (47-0)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
SB0776
    (HB0943 / CH0141)
Economic Competitiveness and Commerce - RestructuringPresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 2:00 p.m.Finance
3/9/2015 - 2:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:42 P.M.