Protection Orders

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 18

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0004
    (SB0977)
Criminal Procedure - Domestic Violence - Active Electronic Monitoring (Amber's Law)Delegate Miller, A.In the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
1/28/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0314 / CH0551
    (SB0346 / CH0550)
Peace Orders - Grounds for ReliefDelegate AtterbearyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 551Judiciary
2/11/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsFamily Law (D4)
HB0512
    (SB0430)
Guardianship of a Disabled Person - Communication and Notification RightsDelegate KittlemanIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Estates and Trusts (N2)
HB0534 / CH0489
    (SB0924)
Family Law - Protective Orders - Notification of Service - Sunset RepealDelegate SanchezApproved by the Governor - Chapter 489Judiciary
2/18/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsFamily Law (D4)
HB0573
    (SB0638)
Possession of Loaded Handgun or Regulated Firearm - Enhanced PenaltiesDelegate ClippingerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciaryCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0819Domestic Violence - Permanent Protective Orders - Probation and Suspended SentenceDelegate AtterbearyIn the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/3/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB0866
    (SB0833)
Civil Right to Counsel - Pilot Program - Domestic ViolenceDelegate RosenbergIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide (D1)
HB0947
    (SB0930)
Public Information Act - Inspection of Records From Body-Worn Digital Recording DevicesDelegate SydnorIn the Senate - First Reading Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsState Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
HB1060Model Residential Leases - Required ContentsDelegate MoralesIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB1263Possession of Loaded Handgun or Regulated Firearm - Enhanced PenaltiesDelegate ClippingerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/15/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB1480Background Check Accountability Act of 2016Delegate LamIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/15/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0328
    (HB0220)
Criminal Procedure - ExpungementSenator ConwayIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsJudicial Proceedings
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0346 / CH0550
    (HB0314 / CH0551)
Peace Orders - Grounds for ReliefSenator RamirezApproved by the Governor - Chapter 550Judicial Proceedings
2/18/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0430
    (HB0512)
Guardianship of a Disabled Person - Communication and Notification RightsSenator BatesIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Estates and Trusts (N2)
SB0638
    (HB0573)
Possession of Loaded Handgun or Regulated Firearm - Enhanced PenaltiesSenator PughIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0833
    (HB0866)
Civil Right to Counsel - Pilot Program - Domestic ViolenceSenator GuzzoneIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide (D1)
SB0924
    (HB0534 / CH0489)
Family Law - Protective Orders - Notification of Service - Sunset RepealSenator RamirezIn the Senate - Conference Committee AppointedJudicial Proceedings
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0977
    (HB0004)
Criminal Procedure - Domestic Violence - Active Electronic Monitoring (Amber's Law)Senator ReadyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Senate Rules; WithdrawnRulesCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:05 P.M.