Psychiatrists

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 12

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0839Public Health - State Advisory Council on PANDAS and PANSDelegate CarrIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0902
    (SB1028)
Health Occupations - Conversion Therapy for Minors - Prohibition (Youth Mental Health Protection Act)Delegate CullisonIn the House - Favorable Report AdoptedHealth and Government Operations
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
HB1096State Government - Veteran Employment and Transition Success ProgramDelegate WaldstreicherIn the House - Passed EnrolledHealth and Government Operations
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
HB1289Correctional Services - Arrested Persons - Mental Disorder ScreeningsDelegate LamIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB1302Public Safety – Extreme Risk Protective OrdersDelegate Valentino-SmithIn the House - Passed EnrolledJudiciary
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/23/2018 - 11:30 a.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB1359Criminal Procedure - Mental Health and Substance Abuse Offender Reentry Support ProgramDelegate AliIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciaryPublic Health (J1)
HB1628Privileged Communications – Mental Health Providers – Exception for Suspected Child Abuse and NeglectDelegate HettlemanIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciaryFamily Law (D4)
HB1652
    (SB0704)
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Telemedicine - Assertive Community Treatment and Mobile Treatment ServicesDelegate Sample-HughesIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesHealth and Government Operations
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
RulesPublic Health (J1)
HB1720Public Schools - Student Discipline - Suspension and Expulsion and PoliciesDelegate PattersonIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0704
    (HB1652)
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Telemedicine - Assertive Community Treatment and Mobile Treatment ServicesSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Passed EnrolledFinance
2/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB1028
    (HB0902)
Health Occupations - Conversion Therapy for Minors - Prohibition (Youth Mental Health Protection Act)Senator MadalenoIn the Senate - Returned PassedEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government OperationsHealth Occupations (J2)
SB1263Public Safety – School Mental Health Services and Mental Disorder Weapon Restraining Order (School Safety Act of 2018: Anticipation)Senator WaughIn the Senate - Hearing 3/23 at 11:30 a.m. (Judicial Proceedings)Judicial Proceedings
3/23/2018 - 11:30 a.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Public Safety (E4)

April 13, 2018 1:39 P.M.