Psychologists

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 13

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0091Health Occupations - Sexual Orientation Change Efforts - ProhibitedDelegate CardinIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations Health Occupations (J2)
HB0113
    (SB0225 / CH0147)
State Board of Examiners of Psychologists - Psychology Associates - RegistrationDelegate HubbardVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Health and Government Operations
1/30/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Health Occupations (J2)
HB0395
    (SB0702)
Health Care Malpractice Claims - Definition of "Health Care Provider"Delegate DumaisIn the House - Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB0641 / CH0196
    (SB0803 / CH0195)
Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Communications Between Patient or Client and Health Care Professional - Exceptions to PrivilegeDelegate SimmonsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 196Judiciary
2/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB1267 / CH0353
    (SB0882 / CH0352)
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Outpatient Services Programs Stakeholder WorkgroupDelegate HubbardApproved by the Governor - Chapter 353Health and Government Operations
3/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/1/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB1339
    (SB0807)
Drivers' Licenses - Disorder, Disease, or Physical Disability - Defining and ReportingDelegate SteinIn the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
3/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB1404Health Care Disparities, Cultural and Linguistic Competency, and Health Literacy - Continuing EducationDelegate Nathan-PulliamIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations Health Occupations (J2)
HB1456 / CH0457Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Board of Review - JurisdictionChair, Health and Government Operations CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 457Health and Government Operations
3/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0225 / CH0147
    (HB0113)
State Board of Examiners of Psychologists - Psychology Associates - RegistrationSenator MontgomeryApproved by the Governor - Chapter 147Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/29/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0702
    (HB0395)
Health Care Malpractice Claims - Definition of "Health Care Provider"Senator PughIn the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0803 / CH0195
    (HB0641 / CH0196)
Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Communications Between Patient or Client and Health Care Professional - Exceptions to PrivilegeSenator RaskinApproved by the Governor - Chapter 195Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0807
    (HB1339)
Drivers' Licenses - Disorder, Disease, or Physical Disability - Identification, Disclosure, and ReportingSenator RaskinIn the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
SB0882 / CH0352
    (HB1267 / CH0353)
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Outpatient Services Programs Stakeholder WorkgroupSenator PughApproved by the Governor - Chapter 352Finance
2/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:36 P.M.