Publications

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 16

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0401 / CH0112Military Department - Powers of the Adjutant General - Summary Courts-MartialChair, Health and Government Operations CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 112Health and Government Operations
2/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0420 / CH0113Vehicle Laws - Maryland Transportation Authority - Payment of TollsChair, Environmental Matters CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 113Environmental Matters
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous (R7)
HB0472 / CH0119Local Government ArticleSpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 119Environmental Matters
2/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Local Government - Generally (L6)
HB0560 / CH0005
    (SB0538)
Public-Private PartnershipsSpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 5Environmental Matters
2/15/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB0570State Government - Inspector GeneralDelegate Miller, W.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government OperationsHealth and Government Operations
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB0576
    (SB0794)
Real Property - Regulation of Common Ownership Community ManagersDelegate BeidleIn the Senate - First Reading Judicial ProceedingsEnvironmental Matters
2/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB0741Public Service Commission - New and Changed Rates - Notice PeriodDelegate CarrIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
HB1191
    (SB0623)
Maryland Assault Weapons Ban of 2013Delegate RosenbergIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/1/2013 - 12:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB1389
    (SB0914)
Workers' Compensation - Reimbursement for Drugs - Fee Schedule and RequirementsDelegate JamesonIn the House - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Workers' Compensation (K1)
SB0059 / CH0173Natural Resources - Fish and FisheriesChair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 173Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/15/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
SB0063 / CH0014Maryland Higher Education Commission - Institutional Renewal Fees and Religious Educational InstitutionsChair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 14Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/16/2013 - 3:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
SB0083 / CH0178Department of Aging - Aging and Disability Resource Center Program - Maryland Access PointChair, Finance CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 178Finance
1/17/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Elderly (O2)
SB0623
    (HB1191)
Maryland Assault Weapons Ban of 2013Senator RaskinIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial ProceedingsPublic Safety (E4)
SB0780Limited Lines Insurance Licenses - Self-Service Storage AgentsSenator PetersIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinance
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Other than Health (C4)
SB0794
    (HB0576)
Real Property - Regulation of Common Ownership Community ManagersSenator KelleyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB0914
    (HB1389)
Workers' Compensation - Reimbursement for Drugs - Fee Schedule and RequirementsSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Rereferred to FinanceFinanceWorkers' Compensation (K1)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:30 P.M.