Publications

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 13

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0041Public Schools - Boards of Education - Anonymous Two-Way Text Messaging Tip ProgramsDelegate ArentzIn the House - Hearing 1/28 at 2:00 p.m.Ways and Means
1/28/2016 - 2:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0200Election Law - Legislative Newsletters - Distribution by Electronic MailDelegate KrebsIn the House - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
2/12/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0365 / CH0262Public Schools - Bullying, Harassment, and Intimidation Policies - UpdateDelegate JacksonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 262Ways and Means
2/18/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0416
    (SB0873)
Health Care Decisions Act - End-of-Life Decision-Making Informational BookletDelegate HillIn the House - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/15/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0453Maryland Education CreditSpeakerIn the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/7/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB0627
    (SB0708)
Vehicle Laws - Drivers' Education Schools and InstructorsDelegate GilchristIn the Senate - First Reading Judicial ProceedingsEnvironment and Transportation
2/25/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsVehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB0727 / CH0496Horse Racing - Satellite Simulcast Betting - Public Hearing RequirementsDelegate WestApproved by the Governor - Chapter 496Ways and Means
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/5/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Horse Racing (C6)
HB0750Public Schools - Electronic Smoking Devices - Policy and Disciplinary StandardsDelegate Miller, A.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and Means
Economic Matters
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0878 / CH0162
    (SB0128 / CH0161)
Maryland Higher Education Commission - Religious Educational Institutions - Authority to OperateDelegate ParrottApproved by the Governor - Chapter 162Appropriations
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHigher Education (F2)
HB1201Election Law - Campaign Finance - Coordinated ExpendituresDelegate EbersoleIn the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB0128 / CH0161
    (HB0878 / CH0162)
Maryland Higher Education Commission - Religious Educational Institutions - Authority to OperateSenator SerafiniApproved by the Governor - Chapter 161Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/27/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/15/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
SB0708
    (HB0627)
Vehicle Laws - Drivers' Education Schools and InstructorsSenator RamirezIn the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
SB0873
    (HB0416)
Health Care Decisions Act - End-of-Life Decision-Making Informational BookletSenator YoungIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/25/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:05 P.M.