Publications

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 10

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0078 / CH0552
    (SB0516)
State Government - Maryland Manual - Revisions (Maryland Manual Modernization Act)Delegate KormanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 552Health and Government Operations
1/26/2017 - 1:30 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsState Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB0165 / CH0553
    (SB0137 / CH0554)
State Government - Maryland Uniform Electronic Legal Materials ActDelegate BarronApproved by the Governor - Chapter 553Health and Government Operations
2/1/2017 - 3:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsState Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
HB0669 / CH0197Public Schools - Boards of Education - Anonymous Two-Way Electronic Tip ProgramsDelegate ArentzApproved by the Governor - Chapter 197Ways and Means
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0898 / CH0852Election Law - Campaign Finance - Coordinated ExpendituresDelegate EbersoleEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 852Ways and Means
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB1163 / CH0643
    (SB0976)
Criminal Procedure - Conditional Release - Electronic Monitoring (Amber's Law)Delegate Miller, A.Approved by the Governor - Chapter 643Judiciary
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0137 / CH0554
    (HB0165 / CH0553)
State Government - Maryland Uniform Electronic Legal Materials ActSenator LeeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 554Judicial Proceedings
1/26/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
SB0310 / CH0587
    (HB0390 / CH0586)
Improving the State Procurement Oversight StructurePresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 587Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
SB0516
    (HB0078 / CH0552)
State Government - Maryland Manual - Revisions (Maryland Manual Modernization Act)Senator ZuckerVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0976
    (HB1163 / CH0643)
Criminal Procedure - Conditional Release - Electronic Monitoring (Amber's Law)Senator LeeIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsJudicial Proceedings
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB1020Maryland Health Care Regulatory Reform Act of 2017Senator MiddletonIn the Senate - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Care Facilities and Regulation (J3)

Denotes enacted legislation

November 28, 2017 1:17 P.M.