Public Corporations and Instrumentalities

2015 Regular Session

Total Bills: 16

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0072 / CH0489
    (SB0057)
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015SpeakerEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 489Appropriations
3/3/2015 - 3:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationOperating Budget (B1)
HB0104Montgomery County - Transit Authority MC 24-15Montgomery County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and Transportation
Ways and Means
Counties - Local Laws (L2)
HB0348
    (SB0468)
Civil Right to Counsel - ImplementationDelegate RosenbergIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
2/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide (D1)
HB0596Criminal Procedure - Maryland Appointed Attorneys Program CorporationDelegate DumaisIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0796Northeast Maryland Waste Disposal Authority - Executive Director and General Counsel - Appointment and CompensationDelegate Miller, W.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB0809
    (SB0540 / CH0181)
Municipalities - Parking AuthoritiesDelegate McMillanVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Environment and Transportation
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsMunicipal Corporations (L3)
HB0867Public Information Act - State Public Information Act Compliance Board and State PolicyDelegate CarterIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
HB0943 / CH0141
    (SB0776)
Economic Competitiveness and Commerce - RestructuringSpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 141Economic Matters
3/9/2015 - 2:00 p.m.
FinanceEconomic and Community Development (C8)
HB0986State Government - Maryland Commission on Efficiency in GovernmentDelegate BromwellIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB1108Maryland Technology Development Corporation - Maryland Innovation InitiativeDelegate FrickIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsEconomic and Community Development (C8)
SB0057
    (HB0072 / CH0489)
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015PresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Operating Budget (B1)
SB0468
    (HB0348)
Civil Right to Counsel - ImplementationSenator MadalenoIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
3/5/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide (D1)
SB0509Northeast Maryland Waste Disposal Authority - Purpose, Appointments, and CompensationSenator HoughIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB0540 / CH0181
    (HB0809)
Municipalities - Parking AuthoritiesSenator AstleApproved by the Governor - Chapter 181Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Municipal Corporations (L3)
SB0758State Government - Equal Access to Public Services for Individuals With Limited English Proficiency - Web SitesSenator KaganIn the House - Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0776
    (HB0943 / CH0141)
Economic Competitiveness and Commerce - RestructuringPresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 2:00 p.m.Finance
3/9/2015 - 2:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:42 P.M.