Public Corporations and Instrumentalities

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 14

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0059
    (SB0085 / CH0338)
Department of Economic Competitiveness and Commerce - Renaming and ReorganizationChair, Economic Matters CommitteeVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Economic Matters
1/27/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB0084
    (SB0116 / CH0049)
State Government - Office of Legislative Audits - Alterations in Audit RequirementsSpeakerVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Appropriations
2/2/2016 - 12:30 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB0462 / CH0010
    (SB0383)
Program Open Space - Transfer Tax Repayment - Use of FundsSpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 10Appropriations
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Natural Resources - Generally (M1)
HB0955
    (SB0267)
Public Schools - Voluntary Nonsectarian Prayer at School-Sponsored Student EventsDelegate MetzgarIn the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/26/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1404 / CH0034
    (SB1130)
Construction Education and Innovation - Establishment of FundDelegate BrooksEnacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 34Economic Matters
3/15/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB1642
    (SB1158 / CH0713)
Higher Education - Morgan State University - Office of Technology TransferDelegate OaksIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesAppropriations
4/5/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
RulesHigher Education (F2)
SB0085 / CH0338
    (HB0059)
Department of Economic Competitiveness and Commerce - Renaming and ReorganizationChair, Finance CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 338Finance
1/21/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersEconomic and Community Development (C8)
SB0093 / CH0345Maryland Workforce Corporation and Health Care Personnel Training Fund - RepealChair, Finance CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 345Finance
1/21/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0116 / CH0049
    (HB0084)
State Government - Office of Legislative Audits - Alterations in Audit RequirementsPresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 49Budget and Taxation
2/3/2016 - 2:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/15/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0267
    (HB0955)
Public Schools - Voluntary Nonsectarian Prayer at School-Sponsored Student EventsSenator SallingIn the Senate - Hearing 2/03 at 2:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/3/2016 - 2:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0324 / CH0013
    (HB0309)
Prince George's County Regional Medical Center Act of 2016Senator MillerEnacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 13Budget and Taxation
2/3/2016 - 2:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Care Facilities and Regulation (J3)
SB0726 / CH0577
    (HB0705)
Maryland Clean Energy Center - Task ForceSenator MathiasApproved by the Governor - Chapter 577Finance
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersUtility Regulation (C5)
SB1130
    (HB1404 / CH0034)
Construction Education and Innovation - Establishment of FundSenator RosapepeVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Budget and Taxation
3/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersPrivate Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB1158 / CH0713
    (HB1642)
Higher Education - Morgan State University - Office of Technology TransferSenator McFaddenEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 713Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
4/5/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:05 P.M.