Public Employees

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 32

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0167 / CH0776Counties and Municipalities - At-Will Supervisory Employees - Residency RequirementsDelegate McCrayApproved by the Governor - Chapter 776Appropriations
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Local Government - Generally (L6)
HB0272Higher Education - Public Institutions of Higher Education - Sanctuary Campus StatusDelegate QueenIn the House - Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
2/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
HB0584 / CH0771
    (SB0572)
Investigational Drugs, Biological Products, and Devices - Right to Try ActDelegate Young, K.Approved by the Governor - Chapter 771Health and Government Operations
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/4/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0614
    (SB0483)
State Personnel - Employees in the Same Classification - Pay RatesDelegate HettlemanIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; WithdrawnAppropriations
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Personnel (P4)
HB0665
    (SB0607)
Labor and Employment - Exemptions From Overtime Pay - Administrative, Executive, or Professional CapacityDelegate TarlauIn the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB0671
    (SB0544)
Baltimore City - Office of the Baltimore City Sheriff - PositionsDelegate AndersonIn the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial ProceedingsEnvironment and Transportation
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCourts and Court Personnel - Local (D2)
HB0700
    (SB0738)
St. Mary's County - Circuit Court Personnel - RepealSt. Mary's County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and TransportationCourts and Court Personnel - Local (D2)
HB0852 / CH0483Courts - Action for Violation of Collective Bargaining Agreement or Breach of Duty of Fair Representation - Limitations PeriodDelegate BarkleyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 483Appropriations
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB0871
    (SB0652)
Education - Community Colleges - Collective BargainingDelegate HaynesIn the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
HB0880 / CH0525
    (SB0450 / CH0526)
Open Meetings Act - Annual Reporting Requirement, Web Site Postings, and TrainingDelegate MoralesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 525Health and Government Operations
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsState Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
HB0966Legislative and Congressional DistrictingDelegate HillIn the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
HB1056Election Law - Court Offices - Nonpartisan ElectionsDelegate FlanaganIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
Elections (G1)
HB1064
    (SB0478)
State Retirement and Pension System - Guaranteed Retirement Income Plan and Retirement Savings PlanDelegate KrebsIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Pensions and Retirement (K4)
HB1145 / CH0730Public School Employee Whistleblower Protection ActDelegate TarlauApproved by the Governor - Chapter 730Ways and Means
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/5/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1171
    (SB1137)
Public School Employees - Required Training on Retirement BenefitsDelegate VogtIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and MeansWays and Means
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1217
    (SB0956)
Dorchester County Board of Education - Nonprofessional Personnel Appointment - Advice and ConsentDorchester County DelegationIn the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education - Local Bills (F3)
HB1365County Student Loan Refinancing AuthoritiesDelegate LisantiIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and MeansHigher Education (F2)
HB1573 / CH0819Prince George's County - Tax Sales - Limited Auction and Foreclosure for Abandoned Property PG 411-17Prince George's County DelegationEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 819Ways and Means
3/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property - Local (Q2)
HB1603Education - County Boards of Education - Removal of County SuperintendentsDelegate AtterbearyIn the House - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0450 / CH0526
    (HB0880 / CH0525)
Open Meetings Act - Annual Reporting Requirement, Web Site Postings, and TrainingSenator MannoApproved by the Governor - Chapter 526Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
SB0478
    (HB1064)
State Retirement and Pension System - Guaranteed Retirement Income Plan and Retirement Savings PlanSenator EckardtIn the Senate - Hearing 2/16 at 9:00 a.m.Budget and Taxation
2/16/2017 - 9:00 a.m.
State Pensions and Retirement (K4)
SB0483
    (HB0614)
State Personnel - Employees in the Same Classification - Pay RatesSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Personnel (P4)
SB0490Labor and Employment - Labor Organizations - Right to Work ActSenator ReadyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB0544
    (HB0671)
Baltimore City - Office of the Baltimore City Sheriff - PositionsBaltimore City SenatorsIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsJudicial Proceedings
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsCivil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0572
    (HB0584 / CH0771)
Investigational Drugs, Biological Products, and Devices - Right to Try ActSenator SimonaireIn the House - House Refuses to RecedeFinance
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government OperationsPublic Health (J1)
SB0607
    (HB0665)
Labor and Employment - Exemptions From Overtime Pay - Administrative, Executive, or Professional CapacitySenator PinskyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinancePrivate Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB0652
    (HB0871)
Education - Community Colleges - Collective BargainingSenator GuzzoneIn the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
SB0683
    (HB0879 / CH0031)
Public Integrity Act of 2017PresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ethics (G2)
SB0738
    (HB0700)
St. Mary's County - Circuit Court Personnel - RepealSenator WaughIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Courts and Court Personnel - Local (D2)
SB0956
    (HB1217)
Dorchester County Board of Education - Nonprofessional Personnel Appointment - Advice and ConsentSenator EckardtIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education - Local Bills (F3)
SB1027 / CH0482Courts - Action for Violation of Collective Bargaining Agreement or Breach of Duty of Fair Representation - Limitations PeriodSenator MannoApproved by the Governor - Chapter 482Finance
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
4/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB1137
    (HB1171)
Public School Employees - Required Training on Retirement BenefitsSenator OaksIn the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 8:30 a.m.Budget and Taxation
3/16/2017 - 8:30 a.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)

Denotes enacted legislation

November 28, 2017 1:17 P.M.