Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 26

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0024 / CH0758Public Safety - Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission Fund - EstablishmentDelegate JacksonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 758Appropriations
2/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
Public Safety (E4)
HB0036 / CH0580Correctional Officers' Retirement System - MembershipDelegate JacksonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 580Appropriations
2/8/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationState Pensions and Retirement (K4)
HB0040Criminal Law and Procedure - Animal Abuse RegistryDelegate FrushIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
1/18/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0542Election Law - Eligible Detainees - Information on Voting RightsDelegate AliIn the House - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0786
    (SB0539)
Correctional Services - Restrictive Housing - LimitationsDelegate Lewis, J.In the Senate - First Reading Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
2/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsPublic Safety (E4)
HB0787 / CH0827
    (SB0629 / CH0828)
Correctional Facilities - Pregnant Inmates - Medical CareDelegate DumaisEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 827Judiciary
2/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsPublic Safety (E4)
HB0848 / CH0480Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Consumer Reporting AgenciesChair, Economic Matters CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 480Economic Matters
2/16/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)
HB0887Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Murder of Specific Individuals or Mass MurderDelegate ShoemakerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0922 / CH0211Maryland Department of Health – "Pill Mill" Tip Line and Overdose ReportDelegate KipkeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 211Health and Government Operations
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Health Occupations (J2)
HB1182
    (SB0988)
Correctional Officers' Retirement System - MembershipDelegate BeitzelIn the House - Hearing 2/22 at 3:00 p.m.Appropriations
2/22/2018 - 3:00 p.m.
State Pensions and Retirement (K4)
HB1289Correctional Services - Arrested Persons - Mental Disorder ScreeningsDelegate LamIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB1359Criminal Procedure - Mental Health and Substance Abuse Offender Reentry Support ProgramDelegate AliIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciaryPublic Health (J1)
HB1523Criminal Procedure - Domestic Violence Offender RegistryDelegate JacksonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1597 / CH0796Occupational Licenses or Certificates – Application Determinations – Use of Criminal History – ReportsDelegate SydnorApproved by the Governor - Chapter 796Judiciary
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1623
    (SB0929)
State Policies, Guidelines, and Regulations - Mitigation of Disparate ImpactsDelegate Lewis, J.In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
HB1629Criminal Procedure - Maryland Animal Abuse RegistryDelegate JacksonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1808Correctional Services - Statewide Inmate Release Programs - Office of Alternatives to IncarcerationDelegate ConawayIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsPublic Safety (E4)
SB0063Correctional Officers' Retirement System - MembershipChair, Budget and Taxation CommitteeIn the Senate - Hearing 1/25 at 9:30 a.m.Budget and Taxation
1/25/2018 - 9:30 a.m.
State Pensions and Retirement (K4)
SB0237Adult Correctional Institutions – Financial Literacy and Entrepreneurship Pilot ProgramSenator RobinsonIn the House - Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
1/30/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
4/4/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0299 / CH0579
    (HB0354)
Correctional Officers’ Retirement System – MembershipPresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 579Budget and Taxation
2/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB0510Correctional Officers' Retirement System - MembershipSenator GuzzoneIn the Senate - Hearing 2/08 at 9:30 a.m.Budget and Taxation
2/8/2018 - 9:30 a.m.
State Pensions and Retirement (K4)
SB0629 / CH0828
    (HB0787 / CH0827)
Correctional Facilities - Pregnant Inmates - Medical CareSenator KelleyEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 828Judicial Proceedings
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0816Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Law Enforcement Officers and First RespondersSenator SallingIn the Senate - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0929
    (HB1623)
State Policies, Guidelines, and Regulations - Mitigation of Disparate ImpactsSenator BensonIn the House - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
SB0988
    (HB1182)
Correctional Officers' Retirement System - MembershipSenator EdwardsIn the Senate - Hearing 2/22 at 8:30 a.m.Budget and Taxation
2/22/2018 - 8:30 a.m.
State Pensions and Retirement (K4)
SB1265 / CH0030Maryland Safe to Learn Act of 2018Senator KlausmeierApproved by the Governor - Chapter 30Budget and Taxation
3/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 31, 2018 1:00 P.M.