Public Works

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 11

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0251 / CH0435
    (SB0323)
Carroll County - Public Facilities BondsCarroll County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 435Appropriations
2/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Local Debt (Bond Bills) (B3)
HB0336Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Service Rates MC/PG 101-17Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County DelegationIn the House - First Reading Environment and TransportationEnvironment and TransportationBi-County Agencies (L5)
HB0358Baltimore City - Department of Public Works - Water and Sewer Service Charges - Qualified Residential CustomersDelegate ConawayIn the House - First Reading Environment and TransportationEnvironment and TransportationCounties - Local Laws (L2)
HB0414
    (SB0355 / CH0388)
Gas Companies - Rate Regulation - Environmental Remediation CostsDelegate BarkleyIn the Senate - Rereferred to FinanceEconomic Matters
2/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
FinanceUtility Regulation (C5)
HB0833
    (SB0886)
Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - College Park Complete and Green StreetsDelegate Barnes, B.In the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/11/2017 - 12:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0892 / CH0427
    (SB0736)
St. Mary's County - Public Facility BondsSt. Mary's County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 427Appropriations
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Local Debt (Bond Bills) (B3)
HB1049Interstate Compact on Washington Area Professional Football Team Franchise Facility IncentivesDelegate MoonIn the House - Hearing 3/02 at 3:00 p.m.Appropriations
3/2/2017 - 3:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB0323
    (HB0251 / CH0435)
Carroll County - Public Facilities BondsCarroll County SenatorsVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Budget and Taxation
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Local Debt (Bond Bills) (B3)
SB0355 / CH0388
    (HB0414)
Gas Companies - Rate Regulation - Environmental Remediation CostsSenator SerafiniApproved by the Governor - Chapter 388Finance
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersUtility Regulation (C5)
SB0736
    (HB0892 / CH0427)
St. Mary's County - Public Facility BondsSenator WaughVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Budget and Taxation
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
4/5/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Local Debt (Bond Bills) (B3)
SB0886
    (HB0833)
Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - College Park Complete and Green StreetsSenator RosapepeIn the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 10:00 a.m.Budget and Taxation
3/11/2017 - 10:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 30, 2017 1:01 P.M.