Public Works, Board of

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 28

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0024Minority Business Enterprises - Time Frame and Monitoring of PaymentsDelegate Robinson, B.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government OperationsHealth and Government Operations
3/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
HB0025Minority Business Enterprises - Board of Public Works - RegulationsDelegate Robinson, B.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government OperationsState Government - Procurement (P2)
HB0026Minority Business Enterprise Program - Former Subcontractors Transitioning to Prime ContractorsDelegate Robinson, B.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government OperationsHealth and Government Operations
3/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
HB0103 / CH0217
    (SB0245 / CH0216)
School Buildings - Solar Technology - Design Development DocumentsDelegate MorhaimApproved by the Governor - Chapter 217Health and Government Operations
2/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/20/2013 - 1:15 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0146
    (SB0174)
Education - Public Charter Schools - Capital Improvement RequestsDelegate KipkeIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
2/5/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0191 / CH0438
    (SB0047 / CH0437)
Procurement - Purchase of American Manufactured GoodsDelegate MitchellApproved by the Governor - Chapter 438Health and Government Operations
2/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsState Government - Procurement (P2)
HB0269Public Schools - Requirements for Controlled AccessDelegate LuedtkeIn the Senate - Hearing 4/02 at 1:30 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)Ways and Means
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/2/2013 - 1:30 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0560 / CH0005
    (SB0538)
Public-Private PartnershipsSpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 5Environmental Matters
2/15/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB0605Public-Private PartnershipsDelegate ClagettIn the House - Hearing cancelled (Environmental Matters)Environmental Matters
Appropriations
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB0800
    (SB0524 / CH0492)
Wetlands and Riparian Rights - Licenses and Permits for Nonwater-Dependent Projects on State or Private WetlandsDelegate FrushIn the House - Hearing 2/22 at 2:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
2/22/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB0860 / CH0647
    (SB0743)
Baltimore City Public Schools Construction and Revitalization Act of 2013Baltimore City DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 647Appropriations
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education - Miscellaneous (F5)
HB0877 / CH0555
    (SB0811 / CH0554)
Procurement - Investment Activities in Iran - Board of Public Works Authority to Adopt RegulationsDelegate MorhaimApproved by the Governor - Chapter 555Health and Government Operations
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsState Government - Procurement (P2)
HB0953
    (SB0907)
Pipeline Safety and Community Protection ActDelegate MorhaimIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
3/8/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0984
    (SB0604)
Public Safety - Gas Pipelines - Construction RequirementsDelegate CardinIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/8/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB1295Procurement - State Funds - Energy Efficient Outdoor Lighting FixturesDelegate CarrIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
HB1319Procurement - Competitive Sealed Proposals - Construction Contracts - Economic Inclusion PlansDelegate RosenbergIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government OperationsHealth and Government Operations
3/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
HB1353 / CH0201
    (SB0188 / CH0200)
Minority Business Enterprises - Participation and Goals and SubgoalsDelegate OaksApproved by the Governor - Chapter 201Health and Government Operations
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsState Government - Procurement (P2)
SB0047 / CH0437
    (HB0191 / CH0438)
Procurement - Purchase of American Manufactured GoodsSenator YoungApproved by the Governor - Chapter 437Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/29/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/3/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
SB0174
    (HB0146)
Education - Public Charter Schools - Capital Improvement RequestsAnne Arundel County SenatorsIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; WithdrawnBudget and Taxation
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0210Elected Officials - Civil Cases - Liability for Costs, Judgments, and Settlements (Taxpayer Protection Act of 2013)Senator SimonaireIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
3/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Local Government - Generally (L6)
SB0245 / CH0216
    (HB0103 / CH0217)
School Buildings - Solar Technology - Design Development DocumentsSenator RobeyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 216Budget and Taxation
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0524 / CH0492
    (HB0800)
Wetlands and Riparian Rights - Licenses and Permits for Nonwater-Dependent Projects on State or Private WetlandsSenator ColburnApproved by the Governor - Chapter 492Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
4/3/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB0538
    (HB0560 / CH0005)
Public-Private PartnershipsPresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 2:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/20/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB0604
    (HB0984)
Public Safety - Gas Pipelines - Construction RequirementsSenator ZirkinIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by FinanceFinance
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0789Procurement - Preferences - Rural County Business Enterprise ParticipationSenator PipkinIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
SB0811 / CH0554
    (HB0877 / CH0555)
Procurement - Investment Activities in Iran - Board of Public Works Authority to Adopt RegulationsSenator RosapepeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 554Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/3/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
SB0907
    (HB0953)
Pipeline Safety and Community Protection ActSenator ZirkinIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by FinanceFinance
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB1008Sewage Sludge Utilization Permits - Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays Critical Area - Judicial ReviewSenator PipkinIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:30 P.M.