Real Estate

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 20

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0366Home Act of 2014Delegate LaffertyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; WithdrawnEnvironmental Matters Human Relations (D5)
HB0412
    (SB0229)
Real Property - Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Disclosures to Purchasers on Resale of Unit or Lot - Limitation on FeesDelegate McMillanIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesEnvironmental Matters
2/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules Real Property (N1)
HB0595 / CH0233Real Property - Foreclosure of Residential Property - Certified Community Development Financial InstitutionsDelegate NiemannApproved by the Governor - Chapter 233Environmental Matters
2/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
Real Property (N1)
HB1038
    (SB0655)
Real Property - Requirements for New Home Sales Contracts - Clarification of TermsDelegate NiemannIn the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
2/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB1043 / CH0441Prince George's County - Deferred Water and Sewer Charges Homeowner Disclosure Act of 2014 PG 413-14Prince George's County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 441Environmental Matters
3/7/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Bi-County Agencies (L5)
HB1080
    (SB0820)
Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Sales - Disclosure and Cancellation RequirementsDelegate GilchristIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; WithdrawnEnvironmental Matters
2/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB1098Housing Discrimination - Source of IncomeDelegate NiemannIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; WithdrawnEnvironmental Matters
2/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Human Relations (D5)
HB1265
    (SB0212 / CH0474)
Fairness for All Marylanders Act of 2014Delegate ClippingerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Human Relations (D5)
HB1322
    (SB0755)
Foreclosure - Moratorium, Notices, Penalties, Redemption Period, and StudyDelegate BraveboyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
2/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB1471State Real Estate Commission - Registration of Residential Rental Property ManagersDelegate StocksdaleIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB1529
    (SB1095)
Real Property - Ground RentsDelegate McIntoshIn the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
3/13/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB0025State Commission of Real Estate Appraisers, Appraisal Management Companies, and Home Inspectors - MembershipSenator ReillyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinance Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB0207
    (HB0259)
Condominiums - Warranty ClaimsSenator KelleyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersJudicial Proceedings
1/30/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB0212 / CH0474
    (HB1265)
Fairness for All Marylanders Act of 2014Senator MadalenoApproved by the Governor - Chapter 474Judicial Proceedings
2/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations Human Relations (D5)
SB0229
    (HB0412)
Real Property - Condominiums - Disclosures to Purchasers on Resale of Unit - Limitation on FeesSenator FroshIn the House - Conference Committee AppointedJudicial Proceedings
1/30/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB0655
    (HB1038)
Real Property - Requirements for New Home Sales Contracts - Clarification of TermsSenator StoneIn the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB0755
    (HB1322)
Foreclosure - Moratorium, Notices, Penalties, Redemption Period, and StudySenator MuseIn the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB0820
    (HB1080)
Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Sales - Disclosure and Cancellation RequirementsSenator ForehandIn the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB1095
    (HB1529)
Real Property - Ground RentsSenator FroshIn the Senate - Conference Committee AppointedJudicial Proceedings
3/13/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB1106 / CH0079Business Occupations - Real Estate Appraisers - Criminal History Records ChecksSenator FeldmanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 79Finance
3/13/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:36 P.M.