Real Estate Investment Trusts

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 7

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0259Campaign Finance - Affiliated Business Entities - Attribution of ContributionsDelegate BoboIn the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0882
    (SB0578)
Corporations and Real Estate Investment Trusts - Miscellaneous ProvisionsSenator FeldmanIn the Senate - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Corporations and Associations (C1)
HB1140 / CH0528
    (SB0697 / CH0527)
Corporations and Associations - ConversionsSenator FeldmanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 528Economic Matters
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCorporations and Associations (C1)
HB1499 / CH0419
    (SB1039)
Campaign Finance Reform Act of 2013SpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 419Ways and Means
3/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsElections (G1)
SB0578
    (HB0882)
Corporations and Real Estate Investment Trusts - Miscellaneous ProvisionsSenator RaskinIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsJudicial Proceedings
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsCorporations and Associations (C1)
SB0697 / CH0527
    (HB1140 / CH0528)
Corporations and Associations - ConversionsSenator RaskinApproved by the Governor - Chapter 527Judicial Proceedings
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersCorporations and Associations (C1)
SB1039
    (HB1499 / CH0419)
Campaign Finance Reform Act of 2013PresidentIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsElections (G1)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:30 P.M.