Recordings

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 26

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0081Criminal Procedure - Cameras in the Courtroom - Criminal Sentencing HearingsDelegate ConawayIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/3/2016 - 2:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0239Baltimore County Police Officers - Body-Worn CamerasDelegate SydnorIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciaryPublic Safety (E4)
HB0308Department of Legislative Services - Office of Information Systems - Video and Audio RecordingsDelegate GrammerIn the House - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
2/12/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - General Assembly (P5)
HB0316General Assembly - Live and Archived Video Streaming of MeetingsDelegate SzeligaIn the House - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
2/12/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - General Assembly (P5)
HB0365 / CH0262Public Schools - Bullying, Harassment, and Intimidation Policies - UpdateDelegate JacksonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 262Ways and Means
2/18/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0413 / CH0265Maryland General Assembly - Pilot Program on Closed Captioning for Video StreamingDelegate CarrApproved by the Governor - Chapter 265Health and Government Operations
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
HB0436
    (SB0468)
Vehicle Laws - Speed Monitoring, Work Zone Speed Control, and Traffic Control Signal Monitoring Systems - RepealDelegate Miller, W.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/18/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB0482Vehicle Laws - Law Enforcement Transport Vehicles - Recording EquipmentDelegate HaynesIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections (R6)
HB0629Criminal Law - Law Enforcement Officers - MisconductDelegate MoonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciaryCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0661Public Safety - Law Enforcement Officers - Firearm CamerasDelegate ConawayIn the Senate - Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0669Law Enforcement - Body-Worn Cameras - Release of Information to PublicDelegate ConawayIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0757Criminal Law - Life Without the Possibility of Parole - First Degree MurderDelegate RosenbergIn the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0760Law Enforcement Officers' Bill of Rights - AlterationsDelegate CarterIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0947
    (SB0930)
Public Information Act - Inspection of Records From Body-Worn Digital Recording DevicesDelegate SydnorIn the Senate - First Reading Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsState Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
HB0984 / CH0330
    (SB0017 / CH0329)
Open Meetings Act - Retention of Minutes and Recordings - RevisionDelegate SaabApproved by the Governor - Chapter 330Health and Government Operations
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsState Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
HB1103Health Care Practitioners - Use of TeletherapyDelegate ReznikIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
HB1111Notary Public - Electronic and Remote Notary ServicesDelegate PlattIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/3/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB1356Motor Vehicles - Vehicle Event Data RecordersDelegate LamIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and Transportation
3/4/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections (R6)
HB1385 / CH0510Public Health - Advance Directives - Procedures, Information Sheet, and Use of Electronic Advance DirectivesDelegate MorhaimApproved by the Governor - Chapter 510Health and Government Operations
3/11/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/6/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0017 / CH0329
    (HB0984 / CH0330)
Open Meetings Act - Retention of Minutes and Recordings - RevisionSenator ReillyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 329Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/21/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
SB0199Transit and Transportation Service - Audio Recordings - Requirements and LimitationsSenator BrochinIn the House - Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/4/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
SB0213State Police - Speed Camera Revenue - Enforcement ActivitiesSenator DeGrangeIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/4/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0328
    (HB0220)
Criminal Procedure - ExpungementSenator ConwayIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsJudicial Proceedings
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0467General Assembly - Live and Archived Video Streaming of MeetingsSenator HoughIn the Senate - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - General Assembly (P5)
SB0468
    (HB0436)
Vehicle Laws - Speed Monitoring, Work Zone Speed Control, and Traffic Control Signal Monitoring Systems - RepealSenator HoughIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
SB0930
    (HB0947)
Public Information Act - Inspection of Records From Body-Worn Digital Recording DevicesSenator FergusonIn the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:06 P.M.