Religion

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 21

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0016Marriage - Religious Organizations - ProtectionsDelegate MetzgarIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciaryFamily Law (D4)
HB0066 / CH0088Residential Child Care Capital Grant Program - RepealChair, Appropriations CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 88Appropriations
1/26/2016 - 3:30 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Children (O4)
HB0729Taxation - Prohibition on Exemptions and Credits for Organizations Having Known Ties to Terrorism (Homegrown Terrorism Prevention Act)Delegate VogtIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and MeansWays and Means
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Miscellaneous (Q7)
HB0764
    (SB0521)
Anne Arundel County - Charitable GamingAnne Arundel County DelegationIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesWays and Means
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
RulesGaming (C7)
HB0878 / CH0162
    (SB0128 / CH0161)
Maryland Higher Education Commission - Religious Educational Institutions - Authority to OperateDelegate ParrottApproved by the Governor - Chapter 162Appropriations
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHigher Education (F2)
HB0955
    (SB0267)
Public Schools - Voluntary Nonsectarian Prayer at School-Sponsored Student EventsDelegate MetzgarIn the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/26/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1050Income Tax Credit - Holocaust SurvivorsDelegate PlattIn the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB1232
    (SB0978)
Child Custody - Legal Decision Making and Parenting TimeDelegate DumaisIn the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB1266
    (SB0881)
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Ticket Transfers, Sales, and ResalesDelegate FrickIn the House - Referred to interim study by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)
HB1379
    (SB0813)
Child Custody and Visitation - Deployed ParentsDelegate Valentino-SmithIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB1444 / CH0652Mary Byrd Wyman Memorial Association of Baltimore CityDelegate AumannApproved by the Governor - Chapter 652Economic Matters
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Corporations and Associations (C1)
HB1465Foster Care - Standards for Foster ParentsDelegate Washington, M.In the Senate - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/3/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB1625
    (SB1152)
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Torah School of Greater WashingtonDelegate KramerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/14/2016 - 9:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0128 / CH0161
    (HB0878 / CH0162)
Maryland Higher Education Commission - Religious Educational Institutions - Authority to OperateSenator SerafiniApproved by the Governor - Chapter 161Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/27/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/15/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
SB0267
    (HB0955)
Public Schools - Voluntary Nonsectarian Prayer at School-Sponsored Student EventsSenator SallingIn the Senate - Hearing 2/03 at 2:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/3/2016 - 2:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0521
    (HB0764)
Anne Arundel County - Charitable GamingAnne Arundel County SenatorsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/11/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
SB0813
    (HB1379)
Child Custody and Visitation - Deployed ParentsSenator HoughIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0881
    (HB1266)
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Ticket Transfers, Sales, and ResalesSenator JenningsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)
SB0978
    (HB1232)
Child Custody - Legal Decision Making and Parenting TimeSenator LeeIn the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/15/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB1152
    (HB1625)
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Torah School of Greater WashingtonSenator MannoIn the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 10:30 a.m.Budget and Taxation
3/14/2016 - 10:30 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB1155Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore County - Talmudical Academy GymnasiumSenator ZirkinIn the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 10:30 a.m.Budget and Taxation
3/14/2016 - 10:30 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:06 P.M.