Rescue Squads

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 17

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0778 / CH0332
    (SB0899 / CH0331)
Local Government - Fire, Rescue, and Ambulance Funds - DistributionDelegate ConwayApproved by the Governor - Chapter 332Health and Government Operations
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsPublic Safety (E4)
HB0889
    (SB0621 / CH0066)
Vehicles Laws - Emergency Vehicles - Motorcades and EscortsDelegate MaloneVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Environmental Matters
3/1/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsVehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB0894Firearms - Dealer's License and Handgun Permit Application FeesDelegate RosenbergIn the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB1004
    (SB0774 / CH0546)
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Maryland Civil Air PatrolDelegate CardinIn the Senate - Rereferred to Budget and TaxationWays and Means
3/8/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationTaxes - Income (Q3)
HB1007
    (SB0744)
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Bohrer Park Miniature Golf CourseDelegate BarveIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/9/2013 - 11:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB1248Workers' Compensation - Average Weekly Wage - Volunteer Company MemberDelegate JamesonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
3/1/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Workers' Compensation (K1)
HB1256Workers' Compensation - Occupational Disease - Post-Traumatic Stress DisorderDelegate RosenbergIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic MattersWorkers' Compensation (K1)
HB1304
    (SB0661)
Privileged Communications - Critical Incident Stress Management and Peer SupportDelegate McComasIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB1314
    (SB0681)
Workers' Compensation - Medical Presumptions - Statute of Limitations on ClaimsDelegate JamesonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
3/1/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Workers' Compensation (K1)
SB0587 / CH0503Higher Education - Charles W. Riley Firefighter and Ambulance and Rescue Squad Member ScholarshipSenator GaragiolaApproved by the Governor - Chapter 503Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
SB0621 / CH0066
    (HB0889)
Vehicles Laws - Emergency Vehicles - Motorcades and EscortsSenator RaskinApproved by the Governor - Chapter 66Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/29/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
SB0661
    (HB1304)
Privileged Communications - Critical Incident Stress Management and Peer SupportSenator JacobsIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0681
    (HB1314)
Workers' Compensation - Medical Presumptions - Statute of Limitations on ClaimsSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinance
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Workers' Compensation (K1)
SB0774 / CH0546
    (HB1004)
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Maryland Civil Air PatrolSenator MathiasApproved by the Governor - Chapter 546Budget and Taxation
3/13/2013 - 1:15 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/4/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB0899 / CH0331
    (HB0778 / CH0332)
Local Government - Fire, Rescue, and Ambulance Funds - DistributionSenator MathiasApproved by the Governor - Chapter 331Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/4/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB1054
    (HB1515 / CH0429)
Transportation Infrastructure Investment Act of 2013PresidentIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRulesTaxes - Transportation (Q5)
SB1055State Aid for Critical Services - County Maintenance of Effort RequirementsSenator MannoIn the Senate - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Operating Budget (B1)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:30 P.M.